Master Printing Group, Inc. v. DMT Solutions Global Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Master Printing Group, Inc.
Defendant: Magna Trucking, LLC, Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC, John, No. 1 to 5 Doe, Unishippers Global Logistics, LLC doing business as Unishippers, DMT Solutions Global Corporation doing business as BLUECREST, Magna Transportation Group and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv02761
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Magna Trucking, LLC. (S,AN)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Master Printing Group, Inc.. Related document(s) #11 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Alias Summons)(Julian, Maximilian)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion for attorney Aaron C. Schepler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10628971, filed by Defendant Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schepler's Verified Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order)(Fiorello, Joseph)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Return of Service unexecuted upon Magna Trucking, LLC c/o Scott Wright, Registered Agent. Service attempted by certified mail on 1/26/2021 filed on behalf of Master Printing Group, Inc. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon DMT Solutions Global Corporation on 1/14/2021, filed on behalf of Master Printing Group, Inc. Related document(s) #3 . (M,MT)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Proposed Stipulation for Leave to Plead to 03/08/21 filed by DMT Solutions Global Corporation. (Fagnilli, David)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Joint Proposed Stipulation for Leave to Plead filed by Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC. Related document(s) #1 , #7 .(Fiorello, Joseph)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certified mail receipt returned for a service package upon Barnhart Crane and Rigging LLC but contains no signature or date. Delivered on 1/7/2021 per USPS website. Related document(s) #3 . (L,Br)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Joseph M. Fiorello filed by on behalf of Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC. (Fiorello, Joseph)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DMT Solutions Global Corporation. (Fagnilli, David)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by David J. Fagnilli filed by on behalf of DMT Solutions Global Corporation. (Fagnilli, David)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Magna Trucking, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7002 2410 0000 2896 5118. (H,SP)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Unishippers Global Logistics, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70190700000010711965. (W,Jo)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70201810000232555391. (W,Jo)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to DMT Solutions Global Corporation placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70201810000232555643. (W,Jo)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (M,MT)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Master Printing Group, Inc.. (Julian, Maximilian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10495318. Filed by Master Printing Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit A - Invoice, #4 Exhibit B - Maintenance Agreement Order Form, #5 Exhibit C - Item descriptions, #6 Exhibit D - Bill of Lading, #7 Exhibit E - Email dated 8/14/2020, #8 Summons Barnhart, #9 Summons Unishippers, #10 Summons Magna, #11 Summons Bluecrest) (Julian, Maximilian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Master Printing Group, Inc. v. DMT Solutions Global Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnhart Crane and Rigging, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M. Fiorello
Represented By: Todd A. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John, No. 1 to 5 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unishippers Global Logistics, LLC doing business as Unishippers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMT Solutions Global Corporation doing business as BLUECREST
Represented By: David J. Fagnilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Transportation Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Master Printing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Maximilian A. Julian
Represented By: Stephen H. Jett
Represented By: Cynthia M. Menta
Represented By: Alexander E. Gertsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?