We Project Inc. v. Relavistic, LLC et al
Plaintiff: We Project, Inc.
Defendant: Relavistic, LLC, M-Partners, Inc., H. Nicolas Seritti, Kevin Cisan, Sunny K. Nixon, Esq., Robert J. Morman, Jr., Mike Hamilton, Christian M. Ibrahim, Anthony Nahra and Maggie C. Petrush, Esq.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02873
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 35 Motion to dismiss count II and IV for civil violations of the Defend Trade Secrets Acts (DTSA) and Computer Fraud and Abuse Act (CFAA) filed by Kevin Cisan, Mike Hamilton, Christian M. Ibrahim, M-Partners, Inc., Robert J. Morman, Jr., Anthony Nahra, Sunny K. Nixon, Esq., Maggie C. Petrush, Esq., Relavistic, LLC, H. Nicolas Seritti. Related document(s) #1 . (Leneghan, David)
February 26, 2021 Filing 34 Motion to dismiss count XI for legal malpractice filed by Sunny K. Nixon, Esq., Maggie C. Petrush, Esq.. Related document(s) #1 . (Leneghan, David)
February 19, 2021 Filing 33 Motion to dismiss counts IX and X for conversion and unjust enrichment filed by Defendant Relavistic, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Leneghan, David)
February 16, 2021 Filing 32 Reply in support of #25 Motion for attorney Samuel M. Adelmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10627429, #23 Motion for attorney Thomas M. Craig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10627402, #24 Motion for attorney Jessica D. Rabinowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10627422, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email dated 3/9/2020)(Streb, Jude)
February 12, 2021 Filing 31 Motion to compel joinder or dismiss for failure to name required necessary party, filed by Defendant Christian M. Ibrahim. Related document(s) #1 . (Leneghan, David). AddedMotion to dismiss on 2/16/2021 (L,MI).
February 11, 2021 Filing 30 Motion to dismiss Counts VII and XII as not being legally cognizable causes of action, with memorandum in support attached, filed by Defendant Relavistic, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Leneghan, David)
February 10, 2021 Filing 29 Reply in support of #6 Motion for costs Motion to stay proceedings until costs are paid filed by Mike Hamilton, Christian M. Ibrahim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A: Outline of R. 41(d) Costs Sheet)(Leneghan, David)
February 9, 2021 Filing 28 Motion to Compel Arbitration & Dismiss or Stay Pending Arbitration, filed by Defendant M-Partners, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement with Arbitration Provisionon, #2 Exhibit 2 - Wire Transfer Consideration Payment for Agreement with Mediation Provision)(Leneghan, David). AddedMotion to stay on 2/28/2021 (L,MI). AddedMotion to Compel Arbitration on 2/28/2021 (L,MI).
February 8, 2021 Filing 27 Motion to dismiss in favor of pending parallel state court action, with memorandum in support attached, filed by Defendant Christian M. Ibrahim. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Action Docket)(Leneghan, David)
February 8, 2021 Filing 26 Opposition to #23 Motion for attorney Thomas M. Craig to Appear Pro Hac Vice; #24 Motion for attorney Jessica D. Rabinowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice; and #25 Motion for attorney Samuel M. Adelmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Christian M. Ibrahim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Excerpts from advisory reports, #2 Exhibit B- Computer Modules Invoice, #3 Exhibit C- Check to Computer Modules, #4 Exhibit D- Shipping Documents) (Leneghan, David)
February 5, 2021 Filing 25 Motion for attorney Samuel M. Adelmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10627429, filed by Plaintiff We Project, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Samuel M. Adelmann)(Streb, Jude)
February 5, 2021 Filing 24 Motion for attorney Jessica D. Rabinowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10627422, filed by Plaintiff We Project, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica D. Rabinowitz)(Streb, Jude)
February 5, 2021 Filing 23 Motion for attorney Thomas M. Craig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10627402, filed by Plaintiff We Project, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas M. Craig)(Streb, Jude)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/4/2021 granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #20 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2021 to answer , move, or otherwise plead in response to Complaint Kevin Cisan answer due 3/1/2021; Mike Hamilton answer due 3/1/2021; Christian M. Ibrahim answer due 3/1/2021; M-Partners, Inc. answer due 3/1/2021; Robert J. Morman, Jr. answer due 3/1/2021; Anthony Nahra answer due 3/1/2021; Sunny K. Nixon, Esq. answer due 3/1/2021; Maggie C. Petrush, Esq. answer due 3/1/2021; Relavistic, LLC answer due 3/1/2021; H. Nicolas Seritti answer due 3/1/2021.(S,KM)
February 3, 2021 Filing 22 Opposition to #6 Motion for costs, and Motion to stay proceedings until costs are paid filed by We Project, Inc.. (Streb, Jude)
February 3, 2021 Filing 21 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Kevin Cisan on 1/29/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #8 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
February 2, 2021 Filing 20 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 03/01/2021 to answer , move, or otherwise plead in response to Complaint filed by Kevin Cisan, Mike Hamilton, Christian M. Ibrahim, M-Partners, Inc., Robert J. Morman, Jr., Anthony Nahra, Sunny K. Nixon, Esq., Maggie C. Petrush, Esq., Relavistic, LLC, H. Nicolas Seritti. Related document(s) #1 . (Leneghan, David)
February 1, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Relavistic, LLC. (Leneghan, David)
February 1, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by M-Partners, Inc. (Leneghan, David)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon H. Nicolas Seritti on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Relavistic, LLC on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Maggie C. Petrush, Esq. on 1/24/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 14 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Sunny K. Nixon, Esq. on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Anthony Nahra on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon M-Partners, Inc. on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Robert J. Morman, Jr. on 1/19/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Christian M. Ibrahim on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by Fed Ex executed upon Mike Hamilton on 1/18/2021, filed on behalf of We Project, Inc. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Streb, Jude)
January 27, 2021 Filing 8 Alias Summons issued to counsel for service upon Kevin Cisan. (L,MI)
January 27, 2021 Filing 7 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by We Project, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Kevin Cisan)(Streb, Jude)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for costs, and Motion to stay proceedings until costs are paid with memorandum in support filed by Mike Hamilton, Christian M. Ibrahim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1 Previously Filed Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit - 2 Previously Filed Verified Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit - 3 Dismissal Notice of Previously Filed Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit - 4 Comparison Chart of Earlier Dismissed Lawsuit and Present Action, #5 Exhibit - 5 Earlier Lawsuit Motion by Defendants (To Stay Discovery & For Protective Order)di, #6 Exhibit - 6 Earlier Lawsuit Motion by Defendants (to Dismiss Complaint), #7 Exhibit - 7 Earlier Lawsuit Motion by Defendants (to Dismiss Amended Complaint and Alternatively Stay Proceedings), #8 Exhibit - 8 Earlier Lawsuit Subpoena Domesticated in Virginia, #9 Exhibit - 9 Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoenas in Earlier Cases, #10 Exhibit - 10 Earlier Lawsuit Subpoenas Issued in Previous Lawsuit which were Domesticated in Ohio, #11 Exhibit - 11 Example of One of Plaintiff TWPI's Previously filed Opposition Pleadings in Earlier Case, #12 Exhibit - 12 State of Ohio Lawsuit Filed Before this Federal Court Action, #13 Exhibit - 13 TWPI's Other Motion in Earlier Ohio case where TWPI Requested the Forum of Maryland, #14 Exhibit - 14 Request to TWPI to Withdraw Virginia Subpoena & TWPI Refusal, #15 Exhibit - 15 Summary of Costs) (Leneghan, David)
January 13, 2021 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Kevin Cisan, Mike Hamilton, Christian M. Ibrahim, M-Partners, Inc., Robert J. Morman, Jr., Anthony Nahra, Sunny K. Nixon, Esq., Maggie C. Petrush, Esq., Relavistic, LLC, H. Nicolas Seritti. (W,CM)
January 12, 2021 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by We Project, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons x10)(Streb, Jude)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by We Project Inc. (Streb, Jude)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint for damages with jury demand against Kevin Cisan, Mike Hamilton, Christian M Ibrahim, M-Partners, Inc., Robert J. Morman, Jr., Anthony Nahra, Sunny K. Nixon, Esq., Maggie C. Petrush, Esq., Relavistic, LLC, H. Nicolas Seritti. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10535772. Filed by We Project Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Non-Disclosure, Confidentiality, Non-Solicitation and Non-Competition Agreement) (Streb, Jude)
December 31, 2020 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,MI)
December 31, 2020 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: We Project Inc. v. Relavistic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relavistic, LLC
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M-Partners, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Nicolas Seritti
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cisan
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunny K. Nixon, Esq.
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Morman, Jr.
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hamilton
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian M. Ibrahim
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Nahra
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie C. Petrush, Esq.
Represented By: David M. Leneghan
Represented By: K. Scott Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: We Project, Inc.
Represented By: Jude B. Streb
Represented By: Justin S. Greenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?