Filing Error
Plaintiff: Patty Carol Leysen
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Beverly Sackler, The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, Kathe Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Allergan PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., jonathan Sackler, Dr. Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., ILENE SACKLER LEFOURT, Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Associated Pharmacies Inc, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc., David Sackler, Miami-Luken, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., J.M. Smith Corporation, Sandoz Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv45107
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 CASE OPENING ERROR. Case improperly assigned a CV designation; OP is the proper designation. This case will be terminated. The case new case number is 1:20op45107 (P,R)
March 18, 2020 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:20-cv-00183. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-140) transferred this action to the Northern District of Ohio. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-140) re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017. Received and filed on March 17, 2020. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/05/2020, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #14 ] is GRANTED, and the time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended for 60 days from the date of this Order.(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/05/2020, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #13 ] is GRANTED IN PART, and the time for all properly served Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and any discovery served with said Complaint is extended for 60 days from the date of this Order, with leave to file a second motion requesting additional time based on the status of the case at that time.(Taylor, Abby) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Discovery Requests, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, KARI) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Discovery Requests by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ADAM L. WHITE on behalf of Plaintiff PATTY CAROL LEYSEN (WHITE, ADAM) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARI R. JOHNSON on behalf of Defendant RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. (JOHNSON, KARI) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL CALLAIS ALLEN on behalf of Defendant RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. (ALLEN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 25, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by PATTY CAROL LEYSEN. (Original document filed in Davidson County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-112 and listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Sheets, Jamie) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (PACKER, LESLIE) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALEX JOHN HAGAN on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS PHARMACY, INC. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2757965.), filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dismissal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Extension of Time Order) (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Filing Error
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILENE SACKLER LEFOURT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Pharmacies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Callais Allen
Represented By: Kari Russwurm Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Carol Leysen
Represented By: Paul D. Coates
Represented By: Garry Whitaker
Represented By: Adam Lee White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?