Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Plaintiff: The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. and Pikeville Medical Center, Inc.
Defendant: Beverly Sackler, John Stewart, Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Abbott Laboratories, Wal-Mart Inc., Actavis LLC, Mark Timney, Dr. Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc. and Tessa F. Rios
Case Number: 1:2020op45060
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 100 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 1:19-cv-00148. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 7, 2020 Filing 99 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Ohio Northern re MDL No.: 2804 (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 98 DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN HIS CIRCUIT by Chief Circuit Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. on 1/30/2020. CASE REASSIGNED to Judge J. Ronnie Greer for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel; Judges Stivers & Greer; TD; KL (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/22/2020; This matter is referred to Chief Circuit Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. for reassignment to a District Judge outside the Western District of Kentucky. cc: Counsel; Chief Judge R. Guy Cole, Jr. (via e-mail); Deborah Hunt, Clerk (via e-mail); Julie Cobble, Chief Deputy Clerk (via e-mail) (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge David J. Hale on 1/16/2020; IT IS ORDERED that Judge David J. Hale RECUSES from this matter and this action is REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for reassignment to another Judge. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel, CM-Judge Stivers (NWT) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of the Judge David J. Hale for final disposition. All future pleadings shall be filed under Civil Action Number 1:19CV-00148-DJH. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. transferring case to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers for reassignment to another Judge. cc: Counsel; TD (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL AND REASSIGNMENT by Judge Justin R. Walker on 1/10/2020. Judge Justin R. Walker RECUSES from this matter and the action is REASSIGNED to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings. Counsel shall change the case number to reflect the initials JHM for all future filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/11/2019 granting #90 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Richie Pharmacal Co. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/11/2019 granting #89 Proposed Agreed Order. IT IS ORDERED that defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., and Anda, Inc. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 90 Proposed Agreed Order by Richie Pharmacal Co. by Richie Pharmacal Co.. (Cook, Matthew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 89 Proposed Agreed Order by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Anda, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Luxton, Steven) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/5/2019 granting #80 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. shall have 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 87 Proposed Agreed Order by Mallinckrodt, LLC by Mallinckrodt, LLC. (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene Lynn Humphreys on behalf of Mallinckrodt, LLC, Specgx LLC (Humphreys, Gene) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/4/2019 granting #83 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Henry Schein, Inc. shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 12/2/2019 granting #82 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walmart Inc., and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 83 Proposed Agreed Order by Henry Schein, Inc. by Henry Schein, Inc.. (Thacker, Christopher) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 82 Proposed Agreed Order for Pharmacy Defendants to File an Answer by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 81 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Exhaustive List of Federal Question Removed Actions Transferred to the Opiate MDL with Pending Motions to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 - Takoma Regional Hospital, Inc., et al. v. Purdue Pharma, L.P., et al. Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - County of Jim Wells v. Purdue Pharma L.P. Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - The Board of County Commissioners of Seminole County, State of Oklahoma v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Memorandum and Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Non-Exhaustive List of Removed Actions Transferred to the Opiate MDL with Pending Motions to Remand Where a Motion to Stay was Filed, #6 Exhibit 6 - County of Alameda, California, et al. v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order Staying Actions Pending JPML ACtion, #7 Exhibit 7 - County of Jim Hogg v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al. Order) (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 80 Proposed Agreed Order by Depomed, Inc. by Depomed, Inc.. (Sadler, Kevin) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #66 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant H. D. Smith, LLC f/k/a H. D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company shall have until 30 days after the Court rules on the pending motion to remand in which to serve an answer or otherwise defend. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #64 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Richie Pharmacal Co. shall have up to and including 12/6/2019, in which to file an answer or otherwise plead. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Second Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction Against Continuation of these Proceedings Against Related Parties by Tessa F. Rios, Amy K. Thompson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Preliminary Injunction Order) (Lowe, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan W. Cuneo. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher J. Lovrien. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah G. Conway. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven A. Martino. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #50 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Conor Brendan O'Croinin. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #49 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David McMullan, Jr. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sarah Sterling Starns. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADMITTING PRO HAC VICE (KEVIN M. SADLER) Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/22/2019 granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.. (Wicker, Kent) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark G. Arnzen on behalf of Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Arnzen, Mark) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 66 Proposed Agreed Order by H.D. Smith, LLC by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Question Removed Cases Transferred to MDL, #2 Exhibit B - Noble County Orders, #3 Exhibit C - Hogg Order, #4 Exhibit D - Seminole Order, #5 Exhibit E - Jim Wells Order, #6 Exhibit F - Jenks Order, #7 Exhibit G - Consent to Remand, #8 Exhibit H - Cardinal Order) (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 64 Proposed Agreed Order re Answer Deadline by Richie Pharmacal Co. by Richie Pharmacal Co.. (Cook, Matthew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Porter Cook on behalf of Richie Pharmacal Co. (Cook, Matthew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Kerrick on behalf of Richie Pharmacal Co. (Kerrick, Thomas) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith, LLC. by H.D. Smith, LLC. (Simpson, W.) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/13/2019 granting #41 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. and Anda, Inc. shall have up to and including 12/6/2019 in which to file their answers or otherwise plead. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AGREED ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 11/13/2019 granting #35 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendant Depomed, Inc. (n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.) shall have up to and including 12/6/2019 in which to file its answer or otherwise plead. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearances of Certain Attorneys for Plaintiffs by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Klein, Mathew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Kennedy Simpson and Joseph A. Wright on behalf of H.D. Smith, LLC (Simpson, W.) Modified to add attorney on 11/13/2019 (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Response to #15 Notice of Deficiency as to Jonathan W. Cuneo filed by Plaintiffs. (See DN #56 .) (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Jonathan W. Cuneo to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2981457. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Wicker, Kent) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 11, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to re #42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2/16/18 - MDL Order Regarding Remands, #2 Exhibit 2 - 7/24/19 MDL Order on Remand, #3 Exhibit 3 - 7/25/18 Remand Order Spartanburg Co., #4 Exhibit 4 - 5/21/18 Remand Order Greenville Co., #5 Exhibit 5 - 3/8/18 Remand Order Dallas Co., #6 Exhibit 6 - 2/1/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay Brooke Co. Comm., #7 Exhibit 7 - 11/21/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay City of Worcester, #8 Exhibit 8 - 7/31/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay Weber Co. Utah, #9 Exhibit 9 - 7/31/18 Order Denying Motion to Stay Unitah Co. Utah, #10 Exhibit 10 - 6/18/19 Remand Order El Monte v. Purdue, #11 Exhibit 11 - 4/16/18 Remand Order County of Van Zandt, #12 Exhibit 12 - 10/9/18 Remand Order County of Lexington, #13 Exhibit 13 - 12/13/17 Transcript of Teleconference Proceedings Regarding Remands) (Wicker, Kent) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Responses to #8 Notice of Deficiency as to Christopher J. Lovrien, #26 Notice of Deficiency as to Sarah G. Conway, filed by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (See DN #52 & DN #53 ). (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 54 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Wendy W. Feinstein re #42 Motion to Stay.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/26/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Christopher J. Lovrien to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2980545. by Defendants Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Sarah G. Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2980512. by Defendants Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Response to #28 Notice of Deficiency: Motion for PHV has been filed by Attorney Steven Martino. (*NO PDF ATTACHED.). (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Attorney Steven A. Martino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 125. Receipt #P33004036; filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (JM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2979253. by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for David McMullan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2978244. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Barrett, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). (Main Document 49 replaced on 11/7/2019) (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Sarah Sterling Starns to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2978231. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Barrett, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). (Main Document 48 replaced on 11/7/2019) (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark Arnzen re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/25/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Depomed, Inc. re #45 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Kevin M. Sadler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Depomed, Inc. (Filing fee $125; Receipt #015170). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to GO 2019-10. Case reassigned to Judge Justin R. Walker for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. no longer assigned to case. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 43 Mail sent to Steve Martino (DN 5 ) Returned as Undeliverable - Refused. (Re-mailed on 11/1/2019 to correct address.) (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #2 Exhibit 1 - Takoma Regional Hospital Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - County of Alameda, CA Order, #4 Exhibit 3 - Conditional Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit 4 - LAC Courte Order, #6 Exhibit 5 - Robinson Ranchera Order, #7 Exhibit 6 - Commonwealth of KY Order, #8 Exhibit 7 - City of Alexandria Order, #9 Exhibit 8 - City of Galax Order, #10 Exhibit 9 - City of Portland Order, #11 Exhibit 10 - City of Mateo Order, #12 Exhibit 11 - Village of Melrose Park Order, #13 Exhibit 12 - City of Jacksonville Order, #14 Exhibit 13 - Delaware County Order, #15 Exhibit 14 - Osage County Order, #16 Exhibit 15 - Pawnee County Order, #17 Exhibit 16 - International Union of Operating Engineers Notification of Docket Entry, #18 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stay) (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 41 Proposed Agreed Order by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Anda, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Actavis LLC, Anda, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc.. (Luxton, Steven) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/29/2019 granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John W. ("Don") Barrett. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreens Eastern Co., Inc. and Walgreen Co., Inc., by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. (Tremper, Frank) Modified to add additional filers and proper corporate parent relationships on 10/30/2019 (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank K. Tremper on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. (Tremper, Frank) Modified to add additional filers on 10/30/2019 (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for John W. "Don" Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2972025. by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Klein, Mathew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/28/2019; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the defendants, CVS, Rite Aid, Walgreens, and Walmart shall have up to and including 12/6/2019 in which to file their answers or otherwise plead, re #1 Notice of Removal, re #34 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. cc: Counsel (CDF) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 35 Proposed Agreed Order by Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc. by Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc.. (Klein, Mathew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 34 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Order of Remand to State Court re #7 MOTION to Remand by ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.. (Klein, Mathew) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth S. Gray and Mark Fenzel on behalf of Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Gray, Elisabeth) Modified to add attorney Fenzel on 10/24/2019 (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Warren Burns re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Indiana, L.L.C.. by CVS Indiana, L.L.C.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Steve Martino re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Sterling Starns re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Sarah G. Conway re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Rick Yelton re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard Barrett re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. (Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Estes Stopher and Robert D. Bobrow on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Stopher, Robert) Modified to add attorney Bobrow on 10/24/2019 (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Monica Miller re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Mark H. Dubester re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Lydia A. Wright re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Korey A. Nelson re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Joseph M. Kramer re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Jonathan W. Cuneo re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to John W. Barrett re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Jennifer E. Kelly re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal,. Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Evelyn Li re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David L. Black re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to David McMullan, Jr. re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Christopher Lovrien re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/11/2019. (KJA) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc., Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., Baptist Healthcare System, Inc., Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation, Grayson County Hospital Foundation, Inc., Pikeville Medical Center, Inc., Saint Elizabeth Medical Center, Inc., St. Claire Medical Center, Inc., Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation, The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc., The Medical Center at Clinton County, Inc., The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Klein, Mathew) Modified to add text on 10/24/2019 (CDF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/24/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (CDF). [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 10/23/2019: This action is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/21/2019. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2019-07. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; EAS [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal from Warren Circuit Court, Civil Action No. 19-CI-01146. cc: Counsel; Christopher Lovrien; David McMullan, Jr., David L. Black; Eveyln Li; Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.; Jennifer E. Kelly; John W. Barrett; Jonathan W. Cuneo; Joseph M. Kramer; Korey A. Nelson; Lydia A. Wright; Monica Miller; Richard Barrett; Rick Yelton; Sarah G. Conway; Sterling Starns; Steve Martino; Warren Burns (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01146. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2964858 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Record, #4 Cover Sheet) (JWM) [Transferred from kywd on 2/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowling Green-Warren County Community Hospital Corporation et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Harrison Memorial Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARH Tug Valley Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor County Hospital District Health Facilities Corporation
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Medical Center at Franklin, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Represented By: Joseph M. Kramer
Represented By: Warren T. Burns
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: David M. McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Barrett
Represented By: Evelyn Li
Represented By: Sterling Starns
Represented By: Mark H. Dubester
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Represented By: J. Kent Wicker
Represented By: Richard R. Barrett
Represented By: Monica Miller
Represented By: Rick Yelton
Represented By: Gerald M. Abdalla, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pikeville Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Richard G. Meyer
Represented By: David L. Black
Represented By: Mathew R. Klein, Jr.
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Jennifer E. Kelly
Represented By: Korey A. Nelson
Represented By: Mark D. Guilfoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Represented By: Steve Brody
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James K. O'Connor
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Represented By: Sarah G. Conway
Represented By: Christopher Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Steven A. Luxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tessa F. Rios
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?