Rhodes et al v. Rhodes Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Silvers, Lea Anne Spradlen and Roger Rhodes
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Allergan Sales, LLC, Richard S. Sackler, Actavis Kadian LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Impax Laboratories, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Theresa Sackler, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, KVK-Tech Inc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, David Sackler, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020op45076
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 24 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Tennessee Middle. Case number 3:19-cv-00885. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pursuant to the Conditional Transfer Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Docket No. 2804, this case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and electronically transmit the record to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/11/2020. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER received from the ND of Ohio. (Case is ready for closing/transfer; proposed order submitted to chambers.) (bs) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 FINAL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER filed by the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL No. 2804, transferring the case to the Northern District of Ohio. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (bs) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 30, 2019 PA State Bar status verified as active for Wendy Feinstein. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Wendy Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3046091) by Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.. (Burkhalter, Stuart) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 5, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock and Stuart A. Burkhalter. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Burkhalter on behalf of Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC (Burkhalter, Stuart) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. Warnock on behalf of Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC (Warnock, Timothy) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: This case is pending transfer to an MDL in the Northern District of Ohio, and the deadline for the filing of responsive pleadings has been extended pending a decision on the transfer. It is therefore ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for December 9, 2019 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, by later order of the court. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/2/2019. (am) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Kirk L. Davies on 12/2/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(Davies, Kirk) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Andrew J. O'Connor; Brien T. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-3040548) by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Declaration of Andrew J. O'Connor, #2 Attachment - Declaration of Brien T. O'Connor, #3 Attachment - Proposed Order)(Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Noramco, Inc. to Answer #1 Complaint. Extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/14/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of Noramco, Inc. by Roger Rhodes, Anthony Silvers, Lea Anne Spradlen. (Jessee, Thomas) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint #11 GRANTED for extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/8/19. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Andrew J. O'Connor and Brien T. O'Connor: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 11/29/2019. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jessalyn H. Zeigler and Sarah Byer Miller. MA State Bar status verified as active for Brien T. O'Connor and Andrew J. O'Connor. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Zeigler, Jessalyn) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: CORRECTED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer #8 is GRANTED for extensions as requested. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/19. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/4/19. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed (Corrected) by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Vlahos, Chris) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc.. (Vlahos, Chris) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons issued as to Allergan Finance LLC and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2019 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons issued as to AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KVK-Tech, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Gordon Ball and Thomas C. Jessee. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 8, 2019 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Gordon Ball and Thomas C. Jessee: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall be admitted to practice. The application for admission is available on the website at #http://www.tnmd.uscourts.gov/forms/admission-practice-application (LR 83.01(a)). Admission due by 10/29/2019. (dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]
October 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMNEAL Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, KVK-Tech, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt Plc,, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3007012), filed by Lea Anne Spradlen, Roger Rhodes, Anthony Silvers. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) [Transferred from tnmd on 2/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhodes et al v. Rhodes Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy W. Feinstein
Represented By: Timothy L. Warnock
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Chris L. Vlahos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Represented By: Jessalyn H. Zeigler
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Stuart A. Burkhalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Silvers
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Thomas C. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Anne Spradlen
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Thomas C. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Rhodes
Represented By: Gordon Ball
Represented By: Thomas C. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?