Stevens v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN K. STEVENS
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Beverly Sackler, Rite Aid Corporation, The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., jonathan Sackler, Dr. Richard Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, KVK-Tech Inc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walmart Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc., David Sackler, Eckerd Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and J.M. Smith Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020op45092
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. CVS Pharmacy Inc. waiver sent on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. KVK-Tech Inc waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 3/23/2020, answer due 5/22/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
April 7, 2020 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/4/2020, answer due 5/4/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 31, 2020 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 31, 2020 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 31, 2020 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 31, 2020 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 30, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 13, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Walmart Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 2/26/2020, answer due 4/27/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by SUSAN K. STEVENS. J.M. Smith Corporation waiver sent on 2/26/2020, answer due 4/27/2020 filed on behalf of SUSAN K. STEVENS (White, Adam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:20-cv-00139. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to NDOH. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-138) re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of March 3, 2020. Received and filed on 03/03/2020. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Motions Referred: RE: #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint, and Discovery, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by SUSAN K. STEVENS. MCKESSON CORPORATION waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (WHITE, ADAM) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint, and Discovery by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by SUSAN K. STEVENS. CARDINAL HEALTH, INC. waiver sent on 2/18/2020, answer due 4/20/2020. (WHITE, ADAM) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL CALLAIS ALLEN on behalf of Defendant RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. (ALLEN, MICHAEL) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARI R. JOHNSON on behalf of Defendant RITE AID OF NORTH CAROLINA, INC. (JOHNSON, KARI) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ADAM L. WHITE on behalf of Plaintiff SUSAN K. STEVENS, ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF TORIA CAPRI STEVENS (WHITE, ADAM) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by SUSAN K. STEVENS, ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF TORIA CAPRI STEVENS. (Original document filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 20-CVS-352 and listed as Attachment #1 to the Petition for Removal) (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS HEALTH SOLUTIONS, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (PACKER, LESLIE) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER W. JACKSON on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS Health Solutions, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (JACKSON, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS PHARMACY, INC. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS Health Solutions, LLC (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CVS HEALTH CORPORATION (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALEX JOHN HAGAN on behalf of Defendants CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, CVS Health Solutions, LLC, CVS PHARMACY, INC. (HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2751617.), filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC., CVS Health Solutions, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(HAGAN, ALEX) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from ncmd on 3/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Solutions, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Alex John Hagan
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of North Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Callais Allen
Represented By: Kari Russwurm Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN K. STEVENS
Represented By: Paul D. Coates
Represented By: Garry Whitaker
Represented By: Adam Lee White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?