Pike County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Pike County, Missouri
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Kathe Sackler, Hospira Inc., Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Dr. Richard Sackler, Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Does 1 through 1000, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Michael Babich, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, David Sackler, Walmart Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45131
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:19-cv-03170. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by R. David Proctor, Acting Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STAY ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's unopposed request for the Court to take judicial notice [ECF No. #18 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Moving Defendants' motion for a temporary stay [ECF No. #11 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that proceedings in this lawsuit are STAYED pending the JPML's final decision on whether this action will be transferred to MDL 2804 pending in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall notify this Court within three days of the JPML's final decision either transferring this action to MDL 2804 or vacating its conditional transfer order. Plaintiff's motion to remand [ECF No. #15 ] remains pending until after the issue of transfer to MDL 2804 is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/16/2020. (CLO) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Pike County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Judge Polster's Order Regarding Remands)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order in Camden County v Dannie Williams, MD, et al.)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pike County, Missouri Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Mallinckrodt LLC's and Specgx LLC's Motion for Temporary Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Transfer Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff Pike County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Pike County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri by Plaintiff Pike County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/23/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (JAB). [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' consent motion [ECF No. #10 ] is GRANTED so that any Defendant's response to Plaintiff's complaint is not due until the later of: (1) a decision of the JPML denying or vacating transfer of this case to MDL 2804 or (2) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action to state court that Plaintiff may file. Nothing in this Order is intended to affect any proceedings that occur or any issues that arise before either the JPML or the Northern District of Ohio with respect to this lawsuit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/18/19. (KKS) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, as of December 10, 2019, Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Hospira, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/13/19. (EAB)[Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs as to Defendant Hospira, Inc (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Pike County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(MFG) (Main Document 6 replaced on 12/9/2019) (MFG). [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober for Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc... (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M. Wacker for Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 1922-CC11661, with receipt number MOEDC-7611295, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan N.V., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. N/K/A Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 201, Inc., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.,, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. f/k/a West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Actavis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition, #2 Exhibit Court File, #3 Exhibit Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Wacker, Lauren) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/2/2019) (MFG). [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pike County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pike County, Missouri
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?