Ray County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Ray County, Missouri
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Hospira Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Walmart, Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Michael Babich, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, SpecGX LLC, JOHN KAPOOR, Actavis Inc, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45132
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:19-cv-03300. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by R. David Proctor, Acting Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Ray County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judge Polster's Order Regarding Remand)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff Ray County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Their Opposition to Motion for Temporary Stay Pending JPMDL's Final Transfer Decision, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendant Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Answer due 60 days after the later of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of the action; or (2) this Court's ruling on a motion to remand this action to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Sarah E Pitlyk on 1/8/20. (KEK) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Bay, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Proposed Order by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Federal Question List, #2 Exhibit 2 - CTO-128, #3 Exhibit 3 - Briefing Schedule, #4 Exhibit 4 - Seminole County Memorandum and Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Ray County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri by Plaintiff Ray County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Text)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ray County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MFG) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M. Wacker for Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Wal-Mart de Mexico, S.A.B. de C.V.; Flipkart Private Limited; Massmart Holdings Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober for Defendant Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC11809, with receipt number AMOEDC-7650224, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 3/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MYLAN INSTITUTIONAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KAPOOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray County, Missouri
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?