Lawrence County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence County, Missouri
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Hospira Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Anazohealth Corporation, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc., Allergan PLC, Ameridose, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Does 1 through 1000, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Michael Babich, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Wal Mart Stores, East, LP, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, SpecGX LLC, Medisca Inc., John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Amerisource Bergen Corporation and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45134
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-00076. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 27 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by R. David Proctor, Acting Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-16-18 Order Regarding Remands)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri re #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Stay filed by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 21 Supplement #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) Modified on 2/10/2020 (MRS). [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Filing 18 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Bay, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay Proposed Order filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Fed Question List, #2 Exhibit 2 -- CTO 132, #3 Exhibit 3 -- Memo and Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Mallinckrodt, LLC and SpecGx's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. [Doc. 11.] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Mallinckrodt, LLC and SpecGx shall file their responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than 60 days after the later entry of either a denial of the transfer of this action to multi-district litigation or this Court's ruling on a motion to remand this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on January 24, 2020. (EMM) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Lawrence County, Missouri - Hospira, Inc. terminated. (BAK) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Lawrence County, Missouri.(BAK) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M. Wacker for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP , Walmart Inc.. (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP , Walmart Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart Inc. . Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Wal-Mart de Mexico, S.A.B. de C.V.; Flipkart Private Limited; Massmart Holdings Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP , Walmart Inc. . (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 1922-CC12053, with receipt number AMOEDC-7696177, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anazohealth Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameridose, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, East, LP
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medisca Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence County, Missouri
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?