City of Santa Fe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Santa Fe
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Abbott Laboratories, McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Nicole Renee Broderson, CVS Health, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Covidien PLC, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., John Bray-Morris and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45137
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Filing 33 Letter filed by City of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence to the Honorable Carl J. Butkus, #2 Exhibit Correspondence to the Honorable Bryan Biedscheid)(McCarley, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico. Case number 1:19-cv-01105. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (bl) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Case Stayed (tah) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales granting #24 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. (tah) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Moving Defendants' responsive pleading now due no later than thirty (30) days after a decision on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [Doc. 4] or a decision by the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation on a conditional transfer, whichever is later. (mlt) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Support re #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Schultz, Andrew) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand , #19 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 14] filed by City of Santa Fe. (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by City of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 14] filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #4 Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and CVS Health Corp.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (mlt) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Notice of Filing State Court File Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1 (A)) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court File)) (Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Expedite Motion to Remand [Doc. 14] by City of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by City of Santa Fe re 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, and Certification of Good Standing (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by City of Santa Fe and Certification of Good Standing (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by City of Santa Fe re 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, and Certification of Good Standing (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 12. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by City of Santa Fe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Salazar, Pia) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6839592 re: # 11 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by City of Santa Fe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Novak, Jonathan) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff City of Santa Fe by Jonathan Patrick Novak (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Novak, Jonathan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6839557 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by City of Santa Fe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Saucer, Sherri) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff City of Santa Fe by Sherri Ann Saucer (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Saucer, Sherri)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6839461 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by City of Santa Fe (Payment made via Pay.gov)(McCarley, Matthew) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff City of Santa Fe by Matthew R McCarley (Association Dues - Online Payment) (McCarley, Matthew)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint (mlt) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint for Certain Manufacturing Defendants by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Allison, Benjamin) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin W Allison on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Allison, Benjamin) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Gerald Grafe, III on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Grafe, Victor) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Amended Complaint by CVS Health, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Baker, Mark) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T Baker on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Baker, Mark) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
November 26, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6822502 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Health Solutions, Inc. from Santa Fe First Judicial District, case number D-101-CV-2019-01809. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Form, #3 Exhibit Santa Fee Service Packet Complaint)(Pound, John) [Transferred from nmd on 4/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Santa Fe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Mark T. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Larry D. Maldegen
Represented By: Michael J. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Renee Broderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: Sean Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Benjamin W. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Mark T. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: John B. Pound
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Victor Gerald Grafe, III
Represented By: Benjamin W. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Harvey B. Fruman
Represented By: H. Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: John B. Pound
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Meghan Dimond Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Larry D. Maldegen
Represented By: Michael J. Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Justin D. Rodriguez
Represented By: Douglas A. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bray-Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Santa Fe
Represented By: S. Ann Saucer
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Novak
Represented By: Pia D. Salazar
Represented By: Patrick W. Sullivan
Represented By: Matthew R. McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?