Falcon v. Allergan PLC, et al
Plaintiff: Leland Falcon
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Walmart Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC, Allergan PLC, McKesson Corporation, Allergan Sales, LLC, Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Florida, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Indivior Inc., Walgreen Company, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS TN Distribution, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Salt Lake City, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Allergan Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Noramco Inc, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc., Sandoz Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45206
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Frank H. Spruiell, Jr filed by on behalf of Morris & Dickson Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Spruiell, Frank)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-01773. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order of MDL Transfer to Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(ko) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (ko) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Notice of Compliance. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document. 2. Filing attorney did not select Warner Chilcott Company, LLC as a filer(s). Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text/added linkage on 7/10/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission of Motion for Remand re: rec. doc. 9 by Actavis LLC, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal by Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Natalie) Modified text/linkage/added filer on 7/10/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal as to McKesson Corporation; answer due 9/8/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/7/2020. (mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Leland Falcon. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 7/1/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Actavis LLC identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. (Crisler, Richard) Modified text on 6/30/2020 (pp). [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Actavis LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crisler, Richard) Modified text/link on 6/30/2020 (pp). Modified text on 7/8/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by McKesson Corporation. By the Clerk.(mm) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COLLATERAL PROCEEDINGS by McKesson Corporation . (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, Assumption Parish, case number 37755 C (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8365523) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) Modified text on 6/22/2020 (mm). [Transferred from laed on 7/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcon v. Allergan PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN DISTRIBUTION, LLC
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: W. Michael Adams
Represented By: Stacey Denise Williams
Represented By: Scott R. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Wholesale Drug Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Brian Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc., Florida
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Franklin J. Foil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Represented By: Russell R. Dickson
Represented By: Frank H. Spruiell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tyler D. Trew
Represented By: James Alcee Brown
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Shannon Marie Jaeckel
Represented By: Kelly Juneau Rookard
Represented By: Douglas John Moore
Represented By: David W. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Karen M. Fontana
Represented By: Glenn Michael Farnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Company
Represented By: John F. Olinde
Represented By: Peter J. Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Knight
Represented By: James Dalton Courson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Gregory T. Stevens
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Camille E. Gauthier
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc., Salt Lake City
Represented By: Leland G Horton
Represented By: Natalie J. Dekaris
Represented By: Richard S. Crisler
Represented By: Michael C Mims
Represented By: C. William Bradley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: Shelley K. Napolitano
Represented By: Richard Munice Crump
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Nicole M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: John F. Olinde
Represented By: Peter J. Rotolo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Madison Sharko
Represented By: Celeste R. Coco-Ewing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Represented By: Craig Douglas Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Falcon
Represented By: Walter John Leger, Jr.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Santana
Represented By: Franklin G. Shaw
Represented By: Matthew S. Landry
Represented By: Brigid E. Collins
Represented By: Wesley J Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?