McDonald County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: McDonald County, Missouri
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP formerly known as Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. doing business as Walmart #5261, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., J M Smith Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cypress Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Smith Drug Company, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., United Research Laboratories, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Total RX Services, Inc. doing business as Total Returns, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, Pharmalink, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Sandoz Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC and UNITHER MANUFACTURING LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45225
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 30 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-00620. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 28 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER STAYING CASE re: #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant Specgx LLC. It is hereby ORDERED that: 1.The Moving Defendants' motion is Granted. 2. The Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's final decision on whether this action will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 06/18/20. (CMH) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice: by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC; GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 05/11/20. (CMH) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS re #13 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC; The Moving Defendants' motion is GRANTED. Moving Defendants shall not be required to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until sixty (60) days after the later of: (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this Court's ruling on a motion to remand this action to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 05/11/2020. (CMH) Modified on 5/12/2020 to correct signature date (CMH). [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Ronnie L. White no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (KXS) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is transmitted to the Clerk of the Court for random reassignment. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/8/2020. (KXS) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff McDonald County, Missouri. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 5/18/2020. (KCB) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC.. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi-district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Michael R. Owens. Review of case shows that Attorney Michael R. Owens is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri, filed by McDonald County, Missouri.(JWD) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Lauren M. Wacker for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Wacker, Lauren) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew A. Jacober for Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Wal-Mart de Mexico, S.A.B. de C.V.; Flipkart Private Limited; Massmart Holdings Ltd., Publicly held company: None,. (Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City Circuit Court, case number 2022-CC00522, with receipt number AMOEDC-7902210, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Jacober, Matthew) [Transferred from moed on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP formerly known as Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. doing business as Walmart #5261
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J M Smith Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Research Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total RX Services, Inc. doing business as Total Returns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmalink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Jacober
Represented By: Lauren M. Wacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITHER MANUFACTURING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McDonald County, Missouri
Represented By: Michael R. Owens
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?