Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Michael Babich, Steven Simon, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Does 1 through 1000, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc., John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Par Pharmaceuticals Inc. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020op45226
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Kurt M. Mullen filed by on behalf of John Kapoor. (Mullen, Kurt)
August 7, 2020 Filing 43 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kansas. Case number 5:20-cv-04022. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated.(jal) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 42 TRANSFER ORDER by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the listed cases to the Northern District of Ohio. (jal) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - The Court grants the motion for a stay #24 , and all proceedings in this action are stayed pending the JPML's decision. Plaintiff's motion for expedited ruling #16 is denied as moot, and the motion for remand #16 remains pending. Plaintiff's request that the Court take judicial notice of various rulings in other courts #28 is granted as unopposed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/29/2020. (ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 5/1/20 & 5/26/20. (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Endo Pharmaceuticals,Inc., served on 4/27/20. (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Endo Health Soultions,Inc., Served on 4/27/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Amended Complaint upon Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., served on 5/1/20 & 5/26/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Complaint upon Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., served on 4/9/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Complaint upon Endo Health Solutions, Inc., served on 4/9/20. (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED of Complaint upon Par Pharmaceutical Companies. Inc., served on 4/7/20 (Van Dyk, Dustin) Modified text on 6/16/2020 (msb). [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 4, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re: #24 MOTION to Stay Case : Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying AmerisourceBergen Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation as corporate parent . (Stubbs, Kara) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #28 MOTION to take Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners, the Court sets a Response deadline of 6/4/2020, and a Reply deadline of 6/11/2020. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/29/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners re: #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling (Van Dyk, Dustin) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cardinal Health, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Nye, Brian) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #28 MOTION to take Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Stay Proceedings. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to take Judicial Notice re #27 Response to Motion to Stay Proceedings by Plaintiff Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A., #2 Exhibit Ex. B., #3 Exhibit Ex. C., #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. F, #6 Exhibit Ex. G, #7 Exhibit Ex. H, #8 Exhibit Ex. I, #9 Exhibit Ex. J, #10 Exhibit Ex. K, #11 Exhibit Ex. L, #12 Exhibit Ex. M, #13 Exhibit Ex. E)(Van Dyk, Dustin) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners re #24 MOTION to Stay Case : Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Van Dyk, Dustin) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #24 Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, the Court sets a Response deadline of 5/28/2020 and a Reply deadline of 6/4/2020. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #24 MOTION to Stay Case : Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #24 MOTION to Stay Case : Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Case : Moving Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling Janssen Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Ruling on Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling : Janssen Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Van Dyk, Dustin) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners. (Van Dyk, Dustin) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Dr. Steven Simon shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Petition forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Moving Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Petition forty-five (45) days after the later of: 1) A decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or 2) This Court's ruling on any motion to remand this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/7/2020. (mn) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - As to the #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners, the Court sets a Response deadline of 5/20/2020, and a Reply deadline of 6/5/2020. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 05/06/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Motion for Expedited Ruling by Plaintiff Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Van Dyk, Dustin) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marilyn B. Keller on behalf of Steven Simon (Keller, Marilyn) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Steven Simon (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Wyrsch, James) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sheena A. Foye on behalf of Steven Simon (Foye, Sheena) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stephen G. Mirakian on behalf of Steven Simon (Mirakian, Stephen) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James Robert Wyrsch on behalf of Steven Simon (Wyrsch, James) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 REVISED LETTER to attorneys from state court case regarding admission requirements for the District of Kansas. (Note: This is a revised version of docket entry # 8 which was missing the full heading.) Letter mailed via US Mail to attorneys Brian T. Kelly and Mark T. Knights; via NEF to all other attorneys. (kkw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 Letter sent to the attorneys that requested pro hac vice status. (kkw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by Sandra J. Wunderlich on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson & Johnson identifying None as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as corporate parent . (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Shawnee County, Kansas, case number 20-cv-000216 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5130581.), filed by Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Wunderlich, Sandra) [Transferred from ksd on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Simon
Represented By: Stephen G. Mirakian
Represented By: James R. Wyrsch
Represented By: Marilyn B. Keller
Represented By: Sheena A. Foye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Represented By: Brian C. Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Sandra J. Wunderlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Todd A. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Brendan L. McPherson
Represented By: Jason L. Bush
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Represented By: Sean M. Sturdivan
Represented By: Tyler Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnee County, Kansas, Board of Commissioners
Represented By: Gary D. White, Jr.
Represented By: Dustin L. Van Dyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?