City of Daphne, Alabama v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Daphne, Alabama
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., McKesson Corporation, Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Xiulu Ruan, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Wal-Mart Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Thomas Justin Palmer, Bridgette Parker, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Cephalon Inc., CVS Indiana L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Sales LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, CVS Pharmacy Inc., Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C., John Patrick Couch, Walgreen Co. Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45227
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - Document uploaded in wrong case Attorney Appearance by S. Gaillard Ladd filed on behalf of Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C.(P,R) Modified on 9/28/2020 (P,R).
September 9, 2020 Filing 46 Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Rockwell filed by on behalf of Thomas Justin Palmer, Bridgette Parker. (Rockwell, Thomas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 45 Attorney Appearance by Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman filed by on behalf of Thomas Justin Palmer, Bridgette Parker. (Kaufman, Kathleen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 1:20-cv-00258. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 6, 2020 Filing 43 Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent electronically (via Extract Civil Case utility) to requesting District. Case Closed. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis R. Bailey on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Bailey, Dennis) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 25, 2020 REFERRAL OF #40 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike, and #41 Reply Brief to Judge Bivins. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff City of Daphne, Alabama re: #39 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Removal Cases) (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 17, 2020 REFERRAL OF #40 Response in Opposition to Supplemental Remand Motion to Judge Granade. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Strike #8 Joinder in Notice of Removal, Alternatively, Surreply to Defective Second Removal Notice filed by Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Sumblin, Anne) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order re: #37 MOTION to Strike #8 Joinder in Notice of Removal, Alternatively, Surreply to Defective Second Removal Notice filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. Defendants are ORDERED to file a response to motion on or before 6/17/2020 and Plaintiff shall file any reply by 6/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 06/03/2020. (srd) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 REFERRAL OF #38 Notice of Opposition to Plaintiff's #37 Supplemental Motion to Remand to Judge Bivins. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Opposition to Plaintiff's #37 Supplemental Motion to Remand by Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc. (Sumblin, Anne) Modified on 6/3/2020 (mab). [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #37 MOTION to Strike #8 Joinder in Notice of Removal, Alternatively, Surreply to Defective Second Removal Notice referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Strike #8 Joinder in Notice of Removal, Alternatively, Surreply to Defective Second Removal Notice filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Judge Polster's Opinion and Order) (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 36 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #35 filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. (APG) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (deGruy, Tiffany) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany Johnson deGruy on behalf of Cardinal Health, Inc. (deGruy, Tiffany) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
June 1, 2020 REFERRAL OF #33 Reply to #26 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation to Judge Senior Judge Granade. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 33 REPLY to #26 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 Filing 32 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #30 filed by Janssen Pharmaceutials, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (APG) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 29, 2020 REFERRAL OF #31 Reply to #25 Response to #7 Motion to Remand to Judge Bivins. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to #25 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutials, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Berdy, Christopher) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 26, 2020 REFERRAL OF #29 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay to Judge Granade. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 22, 2020 REFERRAL OF #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation, #28 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay to Judge Granade. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 22, 2020 REFERRAL OF #25 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #27 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand Judge Bivins. (tot) Modified on 5/22/2020 (tot). [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Walgreen Co., Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc.. (Sumblin, Anne) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.. (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.s Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Radcliff, Donald) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 23 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P., Wal-Mart Inc. (APG) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Hargrove, Alan) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 21 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (APG) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Brown, H.) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 19 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #14 filed by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #16 filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #18 filed by Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement, #17 filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (APG) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo International plc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Generics International (US), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc, Other Affiliate Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Other Affiliate Generics International (US), Inc. for Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc... (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 13, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Endo International plc, Generics International (US), Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Endo International plc, Other Affiliate Generics International (US), Inc. for Par Pharmaceutical, Inc... (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Green, Wilson) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Additional Counsel for the City of Daphne, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mantiply, Mary) Modified on 5/7/2020 (mab). [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order re: Plaintiff's #7 Motion to Remand. Defendants' response due by 5/21/2020. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/7/2020. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time #5 . All properly served Defendants shall have until 10 days after the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. All other requested relief is denied at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/7/2020. (Bivins, Sonja) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #9 filed by Noramco, Inc. (APG) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Noramco, Inc.. (Swann, Gerald) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law; Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #6 Response in Opposition to #5 Moving Defendants' Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Judge Bivins. (mab) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 Joinder in NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc., Walgreen Co., Inc. Supplemental Notice of Removal () (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Sumblin, Anne) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brown v. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #2 Exhibit B - Broward County, FL v. Purdue Pharma, et al., #3 Exhibit C - County of Monroe, MI v. Purdue Pharma, et al.) (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Moving Defendants' Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by City of Daphne, Alabama. (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tot) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Moving Defendants' Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 REFERRAL OF #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (clr) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix CG-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc... (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc... (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2609865, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alsd on 8/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Daphne, Alabama v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Donald C. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiulu Ruan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Wilson F. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany J. deGruy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Justin Palmer
Represented By: Thomas M. Rockwell
Represented By: Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgette Parker
Represented By: Thomas M. Rockwell
Represented By: Kathleen T. Cobb Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Represented By: John A. Henig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Represented By: Gerald C. Swann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Physicians Pain Specialists of Alabama, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Patrick Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co. Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Daphne, Alabama
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?