Frederick County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: Frederick County, Virginia
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., McKesson Corporation, Mylan Institutional Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Insource, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, OptumRX, Inc., Express Scripts Inc., Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Actavis LLC, Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Caremark, L.L.C., Eckerd Corporation, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC, Walgreen Co., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Virginia CVS Pharmacy LLC, Optum, Inc., Caremark Rx, L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Indivior Inc., Cephalon Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Does 1-100, CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, SpecGX LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Walmart Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated and General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020op45233
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 40 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western. Case number 5:20-cv-00030. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 11, 2020 Filing 39 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order from Northern District of Ohio; MDL No. 2804 (kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings; This case is STAYED temporarily pending a decision by the JPML as to whether this case will be transferred to the Opiate MDL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/14/2020. (jv) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay . filed by Frederick County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Frederick County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by Frederick County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Oral ORDER granting #33 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter John Raupp terminated. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/30/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rottenborn, John) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by John Benjamin Rottenborn on behalf of McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. (Rottenborn, John) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 31 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #30 MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 29 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Diversity Based Removals, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cahill Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Work (DOD Contract), #5 Exhibit 5 - Compass Rose Brochure, #6 Exhibit 6 - APWU Brochure, #7 Exhibit 7 - AFSPA Brochure, #8 Exhibit 8 - SAMBA Brochure, #9 Exhibit 9 - GEHA Brochure, #10 Exhibit 10 - Donnelly Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 - OPM Carrier Letters 2010-15(c), 2013-17(c), #12 Exhibit 12 - Compass Rose Audit, #13 Exhibit 13 - APWU Audit, #14 Exhibit 14 - GEHA Audit, #15 Exhibit 15 - OPM Carrier Letter 2004-09a, #16 Exhibit 16 - OPM Carrier Letter 2012-09, #17 Exhibit 17 - OPM Carrier Letter 2018-01, #18 Exhibit 18 - OPM Carrier Letter 2019-10, #19 Exhibit 19- OPM Carrier Ltr 2019-10, #20 Exhibit 20 - OPM Carrier Letter 2020-01, #21 Exhibit 21 - List of Opioid Cases)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CTO-155, #2 Exhibit B - Third Wave Stay Orders, #3 Exhibit C - Third Wave Final Transfer Orders)(Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Support re #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judge Polster Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Martinsville Stay Order)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 26 Exhibit 1 to Dkt. 23 - Express Scripts MHS Statement of Work (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay . filed by Frederick County, Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Transcript of Nov 6, 2017 Hearing)(Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Frederick County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
June 10, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Frederick County, Virginia. (Conrod, Richard) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Oral ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Raymond Daniel Jackson terminated. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/28/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ck) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision . filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO 155, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stay Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fed Officer Removed Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fed Officer Stay Orders, #7 Exhibit 7 - Diversity Based Removals, #8 Exhibit 8 - NY Fraudulent Misjoinder Cases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Federal Question Removed Cases, #10 Exhibit 10 - CAFA Removed Cases, #11 Exhibit 11 - CAFA Stay Orders, #12 Exhibit 12 - Board of Commissioners Opinion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Commonwealth of Kentucky)(Scott, Emily) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily) Modified on 5/28/2020 to correct docket event - this is a motion to stay (kld). [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WalMart Inc.. (Jackson, Raymond) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by William George Laxton, Jr on behalf of WalMart Inc. (Laxton, William) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 Supplemental Certified State Court Records received electronically from Frederick County Circuit Court, CL 20-240 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal)(kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 Certified State Court Records received electronically from Frederick County Circuit Court, CL 20-00240 (Attachments: #1 Records from state court)(kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of Frederick County, Virginia (Spivey, William) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Frederick County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/20/20. (kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. [SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 1st Wave Stay Orders, #2 Exhibit 2 2nd Wave Stay Orders, #3 Exhibit 3 1st & 2nd Wave Final Transfer Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 3rd Wave Stay Orders, #5 Exhibit 5 3rd Wave Final Transfer Orders, #6 Exhibit 6 JPML Hr'g Notices & Order, #7 Exhibit 7 Va. Sup. Ct. MCLA Order)(Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Caremark RX, L.L.C. for Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.; Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; Corporate Parent CaremarkPCS, L.L.C. for CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Requirement to Actavis Pharma, Inc, Actavis, LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Barr Laboratories, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Cephalon, Inc., ENDO Health Solutions, Inc., ENDO Pharmaceuticals, Inc., General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Indivior Inc., Insource, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Specgx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., WalMart Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRx, Inc. (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) Modified on 5/21/2020 to correct docket event (kld). [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRx, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company, Corporate Parent Express Scripts, Inc. for ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Express Scripts Holding Company for Express Scripts, Inc. (kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Express Scripts Holding Company. (kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Frederick County Circuit Court, case number CL 20-240 (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3396225), filed by CVS Health Corporation, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Optum, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc, Caremark RX, L.L.C., OptumRx, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Caremark, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - list of opioid cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Frederick Co Circuit Court documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(kld) [Transferred from vawd on 8/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick County, Virginia v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Peter John Raupp
Represented By: J. Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca C. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution Center, LLC
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Jon Myer Talotta
Represented By: Rebecca C. Mandel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Wells Huntington Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy LLC
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Trucksess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James Kevin Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Justin Michael Sizemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Tirzah Sungyeh Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Peter John Raupp
Represented By: J. Benjamin Rottenborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Marie Fitzgerald
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Represented By: Michael Willis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: William George Laxton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick County, Virginia
Represented By: Patrick Hugh O'Donnell
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?