Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et, al.
Plaintiff: Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund
Defendant: Allergan PLC, Wal-Mart Inc., Beverly Sackler, Walgreen Co, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Actavis PLC, Theresa Sackler, Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rite Aid Corp., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co, RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC, doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Miami-Luken Inc, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Anda Inc, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Wal-Mart Stores Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., The Kroger Co. and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 1:2020op45236
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 Return of Service by personal service executed upon CVS Health Corporation on 10/12/2020, filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 9, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice as to Defendant Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Only filed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Anda Inc waiver sent on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 17 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Stuart D. Baker on 9/25/2020, filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Allergan PLC waiver sent on 9/25/2020, answer due 11/24/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New York Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-03446. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-168:Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-168:Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL No. 2804. Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to HD Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. Summons) (Piper, Francine) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint. Defendant HD Smith Wholesale Drug Company is Listed on the Summons as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company. Defendant Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc. is Listed on the Summons as Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. doing business as Rite Aide., Please correct as to these two defendants only and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Piper, Francine) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda, Inc., Stuart D. Baker, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Kroger Co., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Wal-Mart Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreen, Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Piper, Francine) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Your Proposed Summons was not issued for the following reason: The caption on the Proposed Summons does not match the caption of the Complaint; specifically, if you use "et al" you must attach a rider. Please correct and resubmit using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Incorrect Case/Document Entry Information. Deleted all Defendants and re-entered Defendants to conform to the Complaint. Deleted Document Entry No. 1 (Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet) and re-entered as against all Defendants. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number ANYEDC-13140543 (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flanagan, Doreen) Modified on 7/31/2020 (Flanagan, Doreen). [Transferred from nyed on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et, al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HD Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC, doing business as Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 713 I.B.O.T.U. Welfare Fund
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?