Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico
Defendant: Allergan PLC, McKesson Corporation, Richard S. Sackler, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Insys Therapeutics Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., RHODES TECHNOLOGIES, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., David A. Sackler, Stuart D. Baker, Cephalon Inc., Actavis plc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Cardinal Health Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Miami-Luken Inc, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., SpecGX LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, Noramco Inc, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Jonathan D. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45244
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Par Pharmaceutical Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/9/2020, answer due 12/8/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) without prejudice as to Defendant Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Only filed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Anda Inc waiver sent on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 6, 2020 Filing 12 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Stuart D. Baker on 9/25/2020, filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 9/22/2020, answer due 11/23/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 9/2/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 filed on behalf of Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico (Kassan, Randi)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Puerto Rico. Case number 3:20-cv-01290. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-164) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL # 2804. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols 7/17/2020. (gav) [Transferred from prd on 9/1/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-164) FINALIZED for the transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL # 2804. Signed by Clerk of the Multidistrict Litigation Panel, John W. Nichols 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Tag-Along Actions) (gav) [Transferred from prd on 9/1/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC. f/k/a WATSON PHARMA, INC, Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Beverly Sackler, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., David A. Sackler, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Richard S. Sackler, SPECGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Theresa Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/1/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/1/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6926960.), filed by Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico. Service due by 9/21/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons)(Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from prd on 9/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart D. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Municipality of Cidra, Puerto Rico
Represented By: Douglas H.H. Sanders
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?