Fultondale, Alabama, City of et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al
Plaintiff: Centre, Alabama, City of, Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of and Fultondale, Alabama, City of
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., H.D. Smith LLC, Thomas Mason Dunn, Alt MD PC doing business as Hoover Alt MD, Walgreen Co. Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., John Ladd Buckingham, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Wal-Mart Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Clinic (CCMC) LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Steven Hefter, Austin Haskew, CVS Indiana L.L.C., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Weightloss Clinic and Pain Management (CDPM), Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ngozi Justina Ozuligbo, Doctor Buckingham M.D., Allergan Sales LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Matthew Korcz, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cindy Louis Hyche Dunn, Cindy Dunn, CVS Health Corporation, Henry Schein Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland Inc., Noramco Inc, SpecGX LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Care Complete Medical, Elizabeth Korcz, Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. and Anda Inc
Case Number: 1:2020op45265
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 2:20-cv-00848. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Ohio Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Ohio Northern. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Alt MD PC (Doc 33). (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 31, 2020 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Ladd Buckingham (Doc 33). (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting the #32 motion for extension of time for Defendant Henry Schein, Inc. to file a responsive pleading until thirty days after the later of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this court's ruling on the propriety of remand. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/17/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Henry Schein Inc. (Henig, John) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to re #23 Moving Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Companies Inc. (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of. (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY Brief in Support of #20 filed by Plaintiffs Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of re: #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case Authority)(Frazer, Thomas) Modified on 7/27/2020 (KEK). [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of. (Frazer, Thomas) Modified on 7/27/2020 (KEK). [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is #23 Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation - A response to this motion is due on or before July 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/21/20. (SAC) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Strike #9 Notice of Removal, , #19 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Walgreen Co Inc, Walgreen Eastern Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Sumblin, Anne) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 24 Brief re #23 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation Moving Defendants Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Companies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Stay Moving Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Companies Inc. (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER. On June 29, 2020, the court entered a 15 show cause order requiring Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' arguments about the court's subject matter jurisdiction, and permitting Defendants to reply on or before July 20, 2020. In response, Plaintiffs filed a #19 motion to remand and a #20 motion to strike the #9 supplemental notice of removal. On or before July 20, 2020, Defendants may file one joint response to each motion; the joint responses will also serve as their replies to the court's show cause order. Plaintiffs may file a reply to each joint response, if necessary, on or before July 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/14/20. (SAC) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of. (Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #9 Notice of Removal, by Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Judge Polster's Opinion and Order)(Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Attalla, Alabama, City Of, Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of, Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of, Centre, Alabama, City of, Dadeville, Alabama, City of, Fultondale, Alabama, City of, Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of, Graysville, Alabama, City of, Oakman, Alabama, Town of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Brown v. Endo, #2 Exhibit B. Judge Polster's Opinion and Order, #3 Exhibit C. Judge Poster's Opinion and Order regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Frazer, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC. filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, J) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER vacating the 12 briefing schedule on Defendant Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.'s #11 motion to dismiss. The removing defendants assert in their #1 notice of removal that the court has diversity jurisdiction because any non-diverse defendants were fraudulently joined. Other defendants assert in a #9 supplemental notice of removal that the court has federal question jurisdiction under the Class Action Fairness Act and because this case presents a substantial federal question. The court ORDERS Plaintiffs to respond to all assertions of subject matter jurisdiction, in writing, on or before July 13, 2020. Defendants may file a reply, if necessary, on or before July 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/29/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rite Aid of Alabama Inc, Rite Aid of Maryland Inc. filed by Rite Aid of Alabama Inc, Rite Aid of Maryland Inc (Irvine, George) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP. filed by Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Hargrove, Alan) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ***VACATED*** TEXT ORDER - Before the court is #11 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Assertio Therapeutics Inc. The plaintiffs' response is due on or before July 7, 2020; a reply, if any, is due on or before July 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/23/20. (SAC) Modified on 6/29/2020 (KEK). [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Assertio Therapeutics Inc. (Green, Wilson) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assertio Therapeutics Inc. filed by Assertio Therapeutics Inc (Green, Wilson) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Co Inc, Walgreen Eastern Co Inc Supplemental Notice of Removal from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, Birmingham Division, case number cv-2020-901723. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Sumblin, Anne) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting the #5 motion for extension of time for the moving defendants to file a responsive pleading until thirty days after the later of (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this court's ruling on the propriety of remand. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/17/2020. (RLW) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:20 CV 848 ACA on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE- Due to the nature of this action and case-specific circumstances, the undersigned has determined he will not be able to obtain consent in this action in a timely manner. Therefore, consistent with the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 06/17/2020. (AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time Moving Defendants Emergency Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Motion is RIPE 6/16/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Par Pharmaceutical Inc, Par Pharmaceuticals Companies Inc. (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc (Turner, Sara) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Defendant McKesson Corporation motion for extention of time deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County on 6/4/2020 (exhibit 10 page 682) (AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Defendant Henry Shein Inc. motion for extension of time to answer deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County on 6/14/2020 ( Exhibit 10 page 873) (AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3611118 (ALND receipt# B4601106597). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Health Solutions Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-202--901723., filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Part 4, # 5 Exhibit Part 5, # 6 Exhibit Part 6, # 7 Exhibit Part 7, # 8 Exhibit Part 8, # 9 Exhibit Part 9, # 10 Exhibit Part 10)(AKD). (Turner, Sara) Modified on 6/16/2020 (AKD). [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Health Solutions Inc and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-202--901723., filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5, #6 Exhibit Part 6, #7 Exhibit Part 7, #8 Exhibit Part 8, #9 Exhibit Part 9, #10 Exhibit Part 10)(AKD) [Transferred from alnd on 10/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fultondale, Alabama, City of et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mason Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alt MD PC doing business as Hoover Alt MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co. Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Brandon Keith Essig
Represented By: Harlan Prater, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Phillip Harmon
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ladd Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Wilson F. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany J. deGruy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinic (CCMC) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Represented By: Alan T. Hargrove, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis R. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co. Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hefter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Haskew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Represented By: John Harrison Hagood
Represented By: Cason M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weightloss Clinic and Pain Management (CDPM)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ngozi Justina Ozuligbo
Represented By: Anthony C Ifediba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Buckingham M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales LLC
Represented By: F. Chadwick Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Korcz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Louis Hyche Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Represented By: John Harrison Hagood
Represented By: Cason M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Represented By: Richard K Vann, Jr.
Represented By: John A. Henig, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Represented By: Gerald C. Swann, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: William J. Gamble, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Bert P. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Campbell
Represented By: John Harrison Hagood
Represented By: Cason M. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Complete Medical
Represented By: Anthony C Ifediba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Korcz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sara Marie Turner
Represented By: Leigh Anne Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centre, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attalla, Alabama, City Of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graysville, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Bluff, Alabama, Town of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dadeville, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camp Hill, Alabama, Town of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbertown, Alabama, Town Of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakman, Alabama, Town of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fultondale, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Mary Beth Mantiply
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?