City of Sacramento et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: People of the State of California and City of Sacramento
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Walgreen Co, Rite Aid Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bryant Ranch Prepack, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Endo International plc, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Actavis Inc, Allergan Inc. and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020op45290
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Filing 56 Reply in support of #9 Request to File Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Remand or, in the Alternative, to Grant Motion to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nath, Rohit)
April 6, 2021 Filing 55 Notice of Filing of Return of Service From the Underlying State Court Action filed by City of Sacramento, People of the State of California. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service on Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.)(Nath, Rohit)
April 6, 2021 Filing 54 Opposition to City of Sacramento and The People of California's Request for Leave of Court to File Their Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion for Remand filed by Walgreen Co. Related document(s) #52 . (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
April 5, 2021 Filing 53 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreen Co. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
March 23, 2021 Filing 52 Supplement - CITY OF SACRAMENTO AND THE PEOPLE OF CALIFORNIAS REQUEST FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO FILE THEIR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR REMAND, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, GRANT THEIR MOTION FOR REMAND, filed by City of Sacramento, People of the State of California. Related document(s) #9 . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel Liberson, #2 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Andrew Kolodny, M.D., #3 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Melissa D. Bickel)(Gervais, Michael)
December 23, 2020 Filing 51 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-01824. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 16, 2020 Filing 50 MDL TRANSFER ORDER to Northern District of Ohio, MDL No. 2804. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: The Ex Parte Application by the City of Sacramento, People of the State of California for Reopening the Motion to Remand (ECF No. #48 ) is DENIED. (Deutsch, S.) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Filing 48 EX PARTE APPLICATION by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia for Reopening Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Proposed Order)(Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL MDL Developments in support of #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 11/12/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/6/2020 GRANTING Defendants McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreen Co., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergan Limited, CVS Health Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Thrifty Payless, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, and Bryant Ranch Prepack, Inc. until 1/11/2021 to respond to the complaint. (Coll, A) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to The Complaint by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY in support of #22 Motion to Stay by Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Stevens, Charles) Modified on 10/23/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia to #22 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of FILING BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to and Automatic Stay of Proceedings by Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC (Tsai, Rocky) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. (Tsai, Rocky) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGx LLC. Attorney Tsai, Rocky Chiu-feng added. (Tsai, Rocky) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY in support of #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/9/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kevin James Minnick on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. Attorney Minnick, Kevin James added. (Minnick, Kevin) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/6/2020 ADDING attorney Connor B. O'Croinin, PHV for CVS Health Corporation. (Huang, H) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 OPPOSITION by Walgreen Co. to #9 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Stevens, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Actavis, Inc. served on 8/31/2020 (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: CVS Health Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc. both served on 9/4/2020, answer due 9/25/2020. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Endo Health Solutions Inc. served on 9/1/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Johnson & Johnson served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; Mallinckrodt LLC; McKesson Corporation; Rite Aid Corporation; SpecGx LLC; Thrifty Payless Inc. all served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Actavis LLC; Allergan Inc.; Allergan USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Walgreen Co.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Watson Pharma Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. all served on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 10/1/2020 (Tupolo, A). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bryant Ranch Prepack served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Gervais, Michael Kieran Nickolai added. (Gervais, Michael) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/29/2020 hearing on the Motion to Stay #22 is vacated and submitted without appearance and argument. The opposition or statement of non-opposition and reply due dates shall be filed in accordance with the original motion hearing date. If the Court determines that oral argument is needed it will be scheduled at a later date. Any outstanding request for telephonic appearance is denied as moot. (Deutsch, S) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 25 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CVS Health Corporation for attorney Conor B. O'Croinin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9137958) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Spertus, James) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by James Winston Spertus on behalf of CVS Health Corporation. Attorney Spertus, James Winston added. (Spertus, James) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/24/0202 GRANTING #18 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration, and the expedited briefing schedule set forth in this Court's Minute Order [ 17 ] is VACATED. Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Remand is due by 10/1/2020, and Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, due by 10/8/2020. On the Court's own motion and pursuant to Local Rule 230(g), the 10/15/2020 hearing on the Motion to Remand is VACATED and SUBMITTED without appearance and argument. #7 (Reader, L) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to STAY by Walgreen Co. Motion Hearing SET for 10/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Stevens, Charles) Modified on 9/23/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY by Walgreen Co. re #18 Motion for Reconsideration,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1)(Stevens, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Melissa D. Bickel on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Bickel, Melissa D. added. (Bickel, Melissa) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities by Plaintiffs to #18 Ex Parte Application for Reconsideration filed by Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven G. Sklaver, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/22/2020 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 18 EX PARTE APPLICATION for RECONSIDERATION (#17) Order by Walgreen Co. for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles J. Stevens, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Proposed Order)(Stevens, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by courtroom deputy for Senior District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr.: Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Expedited Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #13 is GRANTED. Defendants' Opposition to the Motion to Remand shall be filed no later than Thursday, September 24, 2020, and Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, shall be filed no later than Monday, September 28, 2020. If necessary, a hearing to be conducted by videoconference will be set for Thursday, October 1, 2020, at 11:00 AM. After briefing is complete, a further order will issue advising the parties whether a hearing will be set. Given the hearing will be conducted by videoconference if needed, not later than seven (7) days prior to the hearing (or any continued hearing date where remote appearances will be necessary) the parties are directed to file with the Court: (1) a waiver of the appearing party's personal appearance signed by the party; and (2) a proposed order addressing the same. If the parties fail to timely comply with this order, the matter may be continued on the Court's own motion without further notice. (Deutsch, S) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/17/2020 ORDERING that Defendants McKesson Corporation; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; Walgreen Co.; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan USA, Inc.; Allergan, Inc.; Allergan Limited; CVS Health Corporation; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGx LLC; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Thrifty Payless, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation; and Bryant Ranch Prepack, Inc. shall have until and including 11/16/2020 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. (Huang, H) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re #13 Ex Parte Application by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 [DISREGARD, DUPLICATE FILING - See #13 Ex Parte Application] EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on #9 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for an Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing on #9 Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rohit D. Nath, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joel K. Liberson on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Liberson, Joel K. added. (Liberson, Joel) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE in support of #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/17/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER re #9 Motion to Remand by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/16/2020 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND by City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Senior Judge Morrison C. England Jr. (Nath, Rohit) Modified on 9/16/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by McKesson, Cardinal Health, Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corp. Attorney Shafroth, Nathan added. (Shafroth, Nathan) Modified on 9/16/2020 (Benson, A.). [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Nathan Shafroth on behalf of McKesson Corporation. Attorney Shafroth, Nathan added. (Shafroth, Nathan) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rohit Dwarka Nath on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. Attorney Nath, Rohit Dwarka added. (Nath, Rohit) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Steven Gerald Sklaver on behalf of City of Sacramento, People of the State of Calfornia. (Sklaver, Steven) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Walgreen Co. (Stevens, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Walgreen Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Stevens, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2020-00279705-CU-FR-GDS by Walgreen Co. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9106468) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (State Court Docket), #3 Exhibit B (Summons & Complaint))(Stevens, Charles) [Transferred from caed on 12/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sacramento et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Charles Joseph Stevens
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Teresa Carey Chow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Ranch Prepack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Steven J. Boranian
Represented By: Eric John Buhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: James W Spertus
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Represented By: Kevin James Minnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Rocky C. Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Represented By: Susana Alcala Wood
Represented By: Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais
Represented By: Joel K. Liberson
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Rohit Dwarka Nath
Represented By: Steven G. Sklaver
Represented By: Michael Gervais
Represented By: Rohit D. Nath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Melissa D. Bickel
Represented By: Susana Alcala Wood
Represented By: Michael Kieran Nickolai Gervais
Represented By: Joel K. Liberson
Represented By: Steven Gerald Sklaver
Represented By: Rohit Dwarka Nath
Represented By: Steven G. Sklaver
Represented By: Michael Gervais
Represented By: Rohit D. Nath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?