Ralls County v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Ralls County
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, 1-1000 DOES, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Mylan N.V., H.D. Smith LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Indivior Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Sandoz Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Par Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 1:2020op45292
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-01252. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
December 15, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY TO RESPONSE #22 IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND by Plaintiff Ralls County (Edgar, John) Modified on 10/9/2020 (TMT). [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, MO filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order Dated 12.26.2019, #3 Exhibit C - Stay Order Dated 1.16.2020, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Interest of The United States of America)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. Parent companies: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation- AmerisourceBergen Corporation & AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: AmerisourceBergen Corporation-Walgreens Boots Alliance Holdings LLC,. (Bennett, James) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Arsenio L. Mims for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Mims, Arsenio) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation. (Bennett, James) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE in Support of Opposition to Mallinckrodt LLC's Motion for a Temporary Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on the Multidristrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Plaintiff Ralls County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A 4:18-cv-11958, Doc. 36, #2 Exhibit Ex. B 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 4, #3 Exhibit Ex. C 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 70, #4 Exhibit Ex. D 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 130, #5 Exhibit Ex. E 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 232, #6 Exhibit Ex. F MDL No. 2804, Doc. 31, #7 Exhibit Ex. G No. 18-4054, Doc. 45-2, #8 Exhibit Ex. H No. 1:18-op-45936, Doc. 2, #9 Exhibit Ex. I No. 1:18-op-45936, Doc. 22, #10 Exhibit Ex. J No. 1:18-op-46120, Doc. 43, #11 Exhibit Ex. K No. 1:17-md-02804, Doc. 1061, #12 Exhibit Ex. L No. 1:17-op-45017, Doc. 43, #13 Exhibit Ex. M No. 8:18-cv-01947)(Edgar, John) Modified on 9/28/2020 (BRP). [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff Ralls County. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, MO filed by Plaintiff Ralls County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Judge Polster's Order)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, MO by Plaintiff Ralls County. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER Re: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/18/2020. (TMT) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC.. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter William Bay for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Bay, Peter) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., H.D. Smith, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Mylan Institutional, Inc., Mylan N.V., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuitical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/26/2020. (TMT) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Ralls County.(MFG) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, lLC, Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Cardinal Health, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CC00763, with receipt number AMOEDC-8143972, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #5 Attachment A, #6 Attachment B, #7 Attachment C, #8 Original Filing Form with attachment, #9 Attachment A)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Matthew T. Schelp. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 12/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralls County v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-1000 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Arsenio Lenell Mims
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Peter William Bay
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralls County
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?