James v. Minute Men HR Select/A&K Sloan
Plaintiff: Kiwanna James
Defendant: Minute Men HR Select/A&K Sloan
Case Number: 1:2021cv00191
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet, Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Kiwanna James. (H,JL)
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 Supplement to #1 Complaint filed by Kiwanna James. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 USM-285, #3 Envelope)(K,AR)
January 22, 2021 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court., Copy of #1 Complaint and Blank Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Kiwanna James at 426 Spieker Terrace, Toledo, OH 43605 on 1/22/2021. Related document(s) #1 . (K,AR)
January 22, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kiwanna James. (K,AR)
January 22, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (K,AR)
January 22, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (K,AR)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Minute Men HR Select/A&K Sloan. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kiwanna James. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documentation, #2 Summons, #3 USM-285, #4 Envelope) (K,AR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Minute Men HR Select/A&K Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiwanna James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minute Men HR Select/A&K Sloan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?