Cole v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Plaintiff: Jason Edward Cole
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00197
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2021 Request to Clerk for refund of erroneous or duplicate on-line filing fee payment. Reason for refund request: Complaint was not attached and had to file a second time to file complaint, clerical error. Receipt #: AOHNDC-10593596, filed by Jason Edward Cole. (Hux, James)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Attorney Hux's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (doc. no. #4 ) is granted. Within 30 days of the date of this order, any new counsel retained by Plaintiff Jason Edward Cole must file a Notice of Appearance on the docket. Attorney Hux is directed to provide a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Cole within 5 days. Entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 2/8/2021.(L,Ja)
February 6, 2021 Filing 4 Motion by James J. Hux to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Jason Edward Cole. (Hux, James)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons not provided, and were not issued. (L,MI)
January 26, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
January 26, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10595183. Filed by Jason Edward Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10593596.. Filed by Jason Edward Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Edward Cole
Represented By: James J.B. Hux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?