Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120 v. Qwest Mechanical Contractors, et al
Plaintiff: Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120
Defendant: Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Qwest Mechanical Corp. and Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00253
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/24/2021 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 4/1/2021. (S,KM)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until April 1, 2021 to answer Complaint, filed by Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Qwest Mechanical Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for 30-day Extension)(Pryatel, Keith)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Qwest Mechanical Corp. on 2/9/2021, filed on behalf of Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120. Related document(s) #2 (R,AP)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Inc. on 2/9/2021, filed on behalf of Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120. Related document(s) #2 (R,AP)
February 2, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 2450 0001 6389 4896. (L,MI)
February 2, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Qwest Mechanical Corp. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7020 2450 0001 6389 4889. (L,MI)
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
February 1, 2021 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (M,MT)
February 1, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-10610106. Filed by Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Predecessor Master Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: Memorandum of Understanding, #3 Exhibit 3: Current Master Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4: Grievance, #5 Exhibit 5: Written Award to Qwest, #6 Exhibit 6: Written Award to Local 120, #7 Summons to Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Inc., #8 Summons to Qwest Mechanical Corp., #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hoffman, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120 v. Qwest Mechanical Contractors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Mechanical Contractors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Mechanical Corp.
Represented By: Keith L. Pryatel
Represented By: Cathryn R. Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qwest Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Keith L. Pryatel
Represented By: Cathryn R. Ensign
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pipe Fitters Local Union No. 120
Represented By: Joseph C. Hoffman, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph D. Mando
Represented By: Jonah D. Grabelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?