United States of America v. Real Property located at 100 Mountain View Drive, Moreland Hills, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel Nos: 913-06-001, 913-06-005 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $2,158,215.00 in U.S. Currency, 1996 Porsche 911 Turbo, Black in Color, VIN: WP0AC2991TS376255, Real Property located at 2110 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-019, Rolex Stainless Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 115234, Serial No. 245E1318, Rolex Stainless Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 116234, Serial No. 17T10743, Real Property located at 806 N Vista Street, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County Assessor AIN 5526-005-024, Real Property located at 100 Mountain View Drive, Moreland Hills, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel Nos: 913-06-001, 913-06-005, Patek Philippe Rose Gold Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 5980/1R-001, Serial No. 797834/6192290, Real Property located at 952 N Laurel Avenue, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County AIN 5529-023-023, $39,108.00 in U.S. Currency, Real Property located at 2104 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-020, 2019 Nautique G25 Boat, HIN: CTC95115K819, with a 2019 Extreme Boat Trailer, VIN: 5DBBB2734KZ005090, Real Property located at 2664 South Green Road, Shaker Heights, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel No. 734-03-026, Vacant Residential Lot located on South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-021, Rolex 18k Rose Gold Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 218235, Serial No. 38HZ3155 and Metalor Kilogram Gold Bar, Serial No. 18144504
Claimant: Rachel Zuchowski, Corner Green LLC, Cary Senders, Ilan Senders, Justin Balay, Jason Zuchowski, 100 Mountain View, LLC, N. Laurel Avenue Property Holdings LLC, ES Global Real Estate Holding LLC, Eyton Senders and David Elliot Builders, Inc.
Intervenor: Select Homes of Northeast Ohio LTD
Case Number: 1:2021cv00564
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by David Elliot Builders, Inc.. (Lucas, Walter)
June 1, 2021 Notice by Clerk that David Elliot Builders, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR)
May 28, 2021 Filing 27 Answer to Complaint filed by David Elliot Builders, Inc.. (Lucas, Walter)
May 27, 2021 Filing 26 Sur-Reply to Brief In Opposition To United State's #19 Motion to stay As To Defendant No. 1 Only filed by Select Homes of Northeast Ohio LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" 11-9-20 email, #2 Exhibit "B" 3-10-21 email, #3 Exhibit "C" Tax Bill)(Yelsky, Mitchell)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. Because the pending Motion to Stay in the above captioned case directly impacts the proceedings before the Court, the Court grants the USA's Motion to Continue the CMC (ECF #24 ) until the Court rules on the Motion to Stay. Should the Motion to Stay be denied the Court will set a new date for the CMC. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/27/21. (S,HR)
May 26, 2021 Filing 25 Response to #19 Motion to stay filed by Justin Balay. (Sherman, Victor)
May 26, 2021 Filing 24 Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Related document(s) #18 . (DeBaggis, Henry)
May 26, 2021 Filing 23 Reply to #22 Opposition to #19 Motion for a Stay filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
May 25, 2021 Filing 22 Opposition to #19 Motion For A Stay filed by Select Homes of Northeast Ohio LTD. Related document(s). (Yelsky, Mitchell) Modified text on 5/25/2021 (S,SR).
May 25, 2021 Filing 21 Response to #19 Motion to stay filed by Eyton Senders. (Searby, Edmund)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 Attorney Appearance by Marc E. Dann and Michael A. Smith, Jr. filed by on behalf of Select Homes of Northeast Ohio LTD. (Dann, Marc) Modified text on 5/21/2021 (S,SR).
May 19, 2021 Filing 19 Motion to stay with affidavit attached filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(DeBaggis, Henry) Modified text on 5/19/2021 (S,SR).
May 18, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic case management conference to be held on 6/3/21 at 02:30 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/18/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Report of Parties Planning Meeting, #2 Exhibit B - Consent Package)(S,HR)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. The Court grants Claimant Justen Balay's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (ECF #17 ). Balay shall file his Responsive Pleading no later than June 29, 2021. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/17/21.(S,HR)
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 29, 2021 to answer filed by Claimant Justin Balay. (Sherman, Victor)
May 11, 2021 Filing 16 Verified Claim of Claimant David Elliot Builders, Inc. filed by David Elliot Builders, Inc.. (Lucas, Walter)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Walter A. Scott Lucas filed by on behalf of David Elliot Builders, Inc.. (Lucas, Walter)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 Motion to intervene as a party filed by Intervenor Select Homes of Northeast Ohio LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Mechanic's Lien, #2 Exhibit "B" Foreclosure Complaint, #3 Exhibit "C" Tax Bill)(Yelsky, Mitchell)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 Claim (Verified) of Justen Balay filed by Justin Balay. (Sherman, Victor)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Victor Sherman for Real Property located at 806 N Vista Street, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County Assessor AIN 5526-005-024. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #12 ) Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/30/21.(S,HR)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for attorney Victor Sherman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Document does not contain an original signature.) Filing fee $ 120.00, receipt number #14660131036, filed by Defendant Real Property located at 806 N Vista Street, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County Assessor AIN 5526-005-024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit of Victor Sherman, #4 Envelope)(M,MT)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]. The Court grants the Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Plead (ECF #11 ). Claimants Eyton Senders, 100 Mountain View LLC, Corner Green LLC, ES Global Real Estate Holdings LLC, and N. Laurel Avenue Property Holdings LLC shall file their Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint no later than June 29, 2021.Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/22/21.(S,HR)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 Agreed Motion for extension of 60 days until June 29, 2021 to answer filed by 100 Mountain View LLC, Corner Green LLC, ES Global Real Estate Holdings LLC, and N. Laurel Avenue Property Holdings LLC . (Searby, Edmund) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (S,SR).
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 SEALED Document: Verified Claim of Real Property located at 100 Mountain View Drive, Moreland Hills, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel Nos: 913-06-001, 913-06-005 filed by 100 Mountain View LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Searby, Edmund)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 SEALED Document: Verified Claim of Real Property located at 2104 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-020, of Real Property located at 2110 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-019, and of Vacant Residential Lot located on South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-021 filed by Corner Green LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Searby, Edmund)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 SEALED Document: Verified Claim of Real Property located at 2664 South Green Road, Shaker Heights, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel No. 734-03-026 filed by ES Global Real Estate Holding LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Searby, Edmund)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 SEALED Document: Verified Claim of Real Property located at 952 N Laurel Avenue, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County AIN 5529-023-023 filed by N. Laurel Avenue Property Holdings, LLC. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Searby, Edmund)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 SEALED Document: Verified Claim of Real Property located at 100 Mountain View Drive, Moreland Hills, Ohio, of Real Property located at 2664 South Green Road, Shaker Heights, Ohio, of Real Property located at 2104 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, of Real Property located at 2110 South Green, Road, South Euclid, Ohio, of Vacant Residential Loc located at South Green, Road, South Euclid, Ohio, of Real Property located at 952 N Laurel Avenue, Los Angeles, California, of Patek Philippe Rose Gold Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 5980/1R-001, of Rolex Stainless Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 115234, of Rolex Stainless Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 116234, of Rolex 18k Rose Gold Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 218235, of Metalor Kilogram Gold Bar, Serial No. 18144504, of $1,158,215.00 in U.S. Currency, and of $39,108.00 in U.S. Currency filed by Eyton Senders. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Searby, Edmund)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order. The Court grants Eyton Senders' #3 Motion and authorizes Senders to file his claims under seal. The Court further orders, per agreement of the Government, the claim forms may only be used in this civil action and that the Government is precluded from using the claim forms in any criminal prosecution. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/9/21.(S,HR)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for leave to file claims under seal, and Motion for protective order filed by Eyton Senders. (Searby, Edmund). Added Motion to seal document on 4/8/2021 (S,HR)
April 7, 2021 Filing 8 Marshal's Return on vehicle, boat, 4 men's watches, gold bar and currency. All assets on attached list are in custody of USMS, filed by United States of America. (L,Br)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for See attached list issued to U.S. Marshal on 03/10/21. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (M,MT)
March 10, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT)
March 10, 2021 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (M,MT)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 285 - Warrant of Arrest, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant Senders c/o Searby, #6 Notice to Potential Claimant - 100 Mountain View, LLC, #7 Notice to Potential Claimant ES Global Real Estate Holding LLC, #8 Notice to Potential Claimant Corner Green LLC on South Green, #9 Notice to Potential Claimant Corner Green LLC on Washington, #10 Notice to Potential Claimant Justen Balay, #11 Notice to Potential Claimant Balay c/o Sherman, #12 Notice to Potential Claimant Cary Senders, #13 Notice to Potential Claimant Ilan Senders, #14 Notice to Potential Claimant Rachel Zuchowski, #15 Notice to Potential Claimant Jason Zuchowski, #16 Notice of Complaint against RP at 100 Mountain View Dive, #17 Notice of Complaint against RP at 2664 South Green Road, #18 Notice of Complaint against RP at 2104 South Green Road, #19 Notice of Complaint against RP at 2110 South Green Road, #20 Notice of Complaint against Vacant Lot on South Green Road, #21 Notice of Complaint against RP at 952 N Laurel Ave, #22 Notice of Complaint against 806 N Vista Street) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property located at 100 Mountain View Drive, Moreland Hills, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel Nos: 913-06-001, 913-06-005 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,158,215.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1996 Porsche 911 Turbo, Black in Color, VIN: WP0AC2991TS376255
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 2110 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-019
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolex Stainless Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 115234, Serial No. 245E1318
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolex Stainless Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 116234, Serial No. 17T10743
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 806 N Vista Street, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County Assessor AIN 5526-005-024
Represented By: Victor Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 100 Mountain View Drive, Moreland Hills, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel Nos: 913-06-001, 913-06-005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patek Philippe Rose Gold Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 5980/1R-001, Serial No. 797834/6192290
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 952 N Laurel Avenue, Los Angeles, California, Los Angeles County AIN 5529-023-023
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $39,108.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 2104 South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-020
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019 Nautique G25 Boat, HIN: CTC95115K819, with a 2019 Extreme Boat Trailer, VIN: 5DBBB2734KZ005090
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 2664 South Green Road, Shaker Heights, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Permanent Parcel No. 734-03-026
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacant Residential Lot located on South Green Road, South Euclid, Ohio, Cuyahoga County Parcel No. 703-22-021
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolex 18k Rose Gold Mens Wrist Watch, Model No. 218235, Serial No. 38HZ3155
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalor Kilogram Gold Bar, Serial No. 18144504
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Rachel Zuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Corner Green LLC
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cary Senders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ilan Senders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Justin Balay
Represented By: Victor Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jason Zuchowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 100 Mountain View, LLC
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: N. Laurel Avenue Property Holdings LLC
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ES Global Real Estate Holding LLC
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eyton Senders
Represented By: Edmund W. Searby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: David Elliot Builders, Inc.
Represented By: Walter A. Scott Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Select Homes of Northeast Ohio LTD
Represented By: Mitchell J. Yelsky
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Michael A. Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?