United States of America v. $66,920.00
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $66,920.00
Interested Party: Tatianna Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00713
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 72.1, the Magistrate Judge may hear and decide all pretrial matters not dispositive of any party's claim or defense and, when appropriate, issue a written order stating the decision. The Court therefore REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz to handle all pretrial matters, including the preparation of a report and recommendation on any dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge may amend the case schedule as needed, if agreeable to the parties. The parties will receive further instructions from Judge Ruiz's Chambers. SO ORDERED. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 5/19/2021. (Y,A)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Serving Answers to Special Interrogatories filed by Tatianna Kennedy. (Gladden, Gregory)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Service of Claimants First Request for Production, Claimants First Set of Interrogatories, and Claimants First Request for Admissions filed by Tatianna Kennedy. (Gladden, Gregory)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem, with affidavit, filed by Tatianna Kennedy. Related document(s) #1 . (Gladden, Gregory)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Gregory C. Gladden for Tatianna Kennedy. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (ECF No. #3 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 4/29/2021. (Y,A)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Service of United States of America's Special Interrogatories to Claimant Kennedy filed by United States of America. (DeBaggis, Henry)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 Claim for Seized Property, with affidavit filed by Tatianna Kennedy. (Gladden, Gregory)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for attorney Greg C. Gladden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10802458, filed by Interested Party Tatianna Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gladden, Gregory)
April 1, 2021 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $66,920.00 issued to U.S. Marshal on 4/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Department of Treasury Receipt) (S,SR)
April 1, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
April 1, 2021 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (S,SR)
April 1, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $66,920.00 in U.S. Currency.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Customs 285 - Warrant of Arrest, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant - Tatianna Kennedy c/o counsel) (DeBaggis, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $66,920.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Tatianna Kennedy
Represented By: Gregory C. Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $66,920.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?