Adams v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Plaintiff: Maurice Adams
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01002
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order: Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice is So Ordered. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/11/22. (LC,S) re #19
March 11, 2022 Filing 19 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) filed by Maurice Adams. (Wido, Christopher)
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 Motion for extension of time until March 8, 2022 to file dismissal filed by Plaintiff Maurice Adams. (Wido, Christopher)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Dismissal is granted to 3/8/22. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/22/22. (LC,S) re #18
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] At the parties' request, a dismissal entry is now due on or before February 22, 2022. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 2/08/22. (D,Ma)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Per attorneys Chris Wido and Mitch Robinson, case is settled. The Court anticipates a dismissal entry on or before 2/02/22. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 12/29/21. (D,Ma)
November 9, 2021 Minutes/Order [non-document]: Status Conference was held. Telephonic Status Conference is set 1/4/22 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call with attorneys only. However, the parties must be available for immediate contact. Counsel shall provide to the Court three business days prior to the conference a joint Status Report or confidential individual Status Reports describing the status of discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. The Status Report(s) need not be filed, but may be delivered via e-mail at Gaughan_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/9/21. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins.
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 Acknowledgement of receipt of remand received on 8/23/21 from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas.Related document(s) #16 . (L,Br)
August 9, 2021 Filing 16 Certified copy of order of remand of Count IV and docket sheet mailed to Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. Related document(s) #15 . (S,SR)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order granting the joint #14 Motion to Sever and Remand Plaintiff's R.C. 4123.90 Claim (Count IV), only, to State Court (Related Doc #14 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/9/2021. (H,SP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulation and Joint Motion to sever and remand R.C. 4123.90 Claim (Count IV Only) to State Court filed by Plaintiff Maurice Adams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wido, Christopher)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 Case Management Order: Case Management Conference was held on 7/7/21. Case is assigned to the standard track. Case is not suitable for Mediation/Settlement Conference at this time. Non-expert discovery shall be completed on or before 2/1/22. Expert reports shall be exchanged on or before 11/30/21 for party with burden of proof & 1/17/22 for Rebuttal and Expert Discovery shall be completed on or before 2/28/22. Pleadings shall be amended without leave of Court and new parties shall be joined on or before 8/1/21. Dispositive Motions shall be filed on or before 3/1/22. Motion to Remand, if any, is due 8/7/21. Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/9/21 at 9:00 a.m. The Court will initiate the call with attorneys only. However, the parties must be available for immediate contact. Counsel shall confer within three business days of any scheduled conference to discuss outstanding issues and respective positions as to settlement. Counsel shall provide to the Court three business days prior to the conference a joint Status Report or confidential individual Status Reports describing the status of discovery, settlement positions, and issues to be addressed. The Status Report(s) need not be filed, but may be delivered via e-mail at Gaughan_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/7/21. (LC,S) Time: 30 mins.
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Valdez, Carrie, s/ by Mitchell A. Robinson)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Robinson, Mitchell).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond is Granted to 6/30/21. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/22/21. (LC,S) re #10
June 21, 2021 Filing 10 Final unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 30, 2021 to , move, plead, or otherwise respond filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mitchell)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 21, 2021 to answer, move, plead or otherwise respond filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mitchell)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond is Granted to 6/21/21. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/11/21. (LC,S) re #9
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR- Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 7/7/2021 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/07/21. (D,Ma) Modified on 6/9/2021 (LC,S).
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 7/7/2021 at 08:45 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/07/21. (D,Ma)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Plead or Otherwise Respond is Granted to 6/11/21. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/27/21. (LC,S) re #6
May 26, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 11, 2021 to move, plead or otherwise respond filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mitchell)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission of Eric Barnum to the Bar of This Court Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/21/21. (LC,S)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Defendant's Motion for Admission of Mitchell Robinson to the Bar of This Court Pro Hac Vice is Granted. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 5/21/21. (LC,S)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Mitchell Allan Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10843154, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Mitchell Robinson, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Mitchell Robinson)(Valdez, Carrie)
May 20, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Eric Leroy Barnum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10843110, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Eric Barnum, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Eric Barnum)(Valdez, Carrie)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (L,Ja)
May 14, 2021 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (L,Ja)
May 14, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,Ja)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Amazon.com Sales, Inc. for Amazon.com Services LLC filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Valdez, Carrie)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-21-946131 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10832063.. Filed by Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint from State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Valdez, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Amazon.com Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Valdez
Represented By: Mitchell A. Robinson
Represented By: Eric L. Barnum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Adams
Represented By: Samuel B. Robb
Represented By: Christopher P. Wido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?