United States of America v. $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Interested Party: Thomas Higgins
Case Number: 1:2021cv01124
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Claim filed by Thomas Higgins. (Sorber, Benjamin)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Thomas Higgins. (Sorber, Benjamin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $20,000.00 issued to U.S. Marshal on 06/04/2021. (Attachments: #1 Department of Treasury Receipt) (M,MT)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe, #3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #4 Process Receipt, #5 Notice to Potential Claimant, Thomas Higgins (c/o Attorney Sorber)) (DeBaggis, Henry).
June 4, 2021 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (M,MT)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 72.1, the Magistrate Judge may hear and decide all pretrial matters not dispositive of any party's claim or defense and, when appropriate, issue a written order stating the decision. The Court therefore REFERS this matter to Magistrate William H. Baughman to resolve any pretrial matters the parties may raise in connection with these proceedings. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 6/4/2021. (Y,A)
June 4, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Thomas Higgins
Represented By: Benjamin R. Sorber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Henry F. DeBaggis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?