Patrick v. Kasaris et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Patrick
Defendant: Charles Fioritto, Michael R. Gareau, Jr., Michael J. Gordillo, Damian A. Billiak and Daniel Kasaris
Case Number: 1:2021cv01155
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 15 Motion for judgment on the pleadings with memorandum in support filed by Charles Fioritto, Michael R. Gareau, Jr, Michael J. Gordillo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report and Recommendation)(Herman, Amy)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Charles Fioritto, Michael R. Gareau, Jr, Michael J. Gordillo. (Herman, Amy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss and Memorandum in Opposition to a Temporary Restraining Order filed by Damian A. Billiak, Daniel Kasaris. (Comstock, David)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to strike portions of the complaint filed by Defendant Daniel Kasaris. (Comstock, David)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Damian A. Billiak, unsigned on 6/24/2021 (marked covid 19), filed on behalf of Damian A. Billiak Related document(s) #2 . (M,MT)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Daniel Kasaris at 30 East Broad Street, 14th floor, Columbus, OH 43215 on 6/25/2021, filed on behalf of Kelly Patrick Related document(s) #2 . (M,MT)
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Michael J. Gordillo on 6/23/2021 (marked covid 19), no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Kelly Patrick Related document(s) #2 . (M,MT)
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by certified mail unexecuted upon Daniel Kasaris, filed on behalf of Kelly Patrick Related document(s) #2 . (M,MT) Green card does not contain a signature. Modified text on 8/2/2021 (S,SR).
July 29, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Michael R. Gareau, Jr on 6/23/2021 (marked covid 19), no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Kelly Patrick Related document(s) #2 . (M,MT)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Charles Fioritto on 6/23/2021 (marked covid 19), no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Kelly Patrick Related document(s) #2 . (M,MT)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until 8/04/2021. Damian A. Billiak answer due 8/4/2021; Daniel Kasaris answer due 8/4/2021. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/28/2021.(R,Sh)
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for extension of 12 days until 08/04/2021 to answer the complaint filed by Damian A. Billiak, Daniel Kasaris. (Comstock, David)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by David Cooper Comstock, Jr and Jacob P. Nicholas filed by on behalf of Damian A. Billiak, Daniel Kasaris. (Comstock, David) Modified text on 7/26/2021 (S,SR).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for extension of 21 days until August 4, 2021 to answer Move or Plead to Complaint filed by Charles Fioritto, Michael R. Gareau, Jr, Michael J. Gordillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James A. Climer)(Climer, James)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #3 Motion for extension of time until August 4, 2021 to answer Move or Plead to Complaint Charles Fioritto answer due 8/4/2021; Michael R. Gareau, Jr answer due 8/4/2021; Michael J. Gordillo answer due 8/4/2021. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 7/12/2021.(R,Sh)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Plaintiff at 8883 Holly Lane, Olmsted Falls, OH 44138 for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt #14660132011. Filed by Kelly Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Cease & Desist Letter, #3 Exhibit B - Short Story, #4 Exhibit C - Website Screenshot, #5 Exhibit D - Police Report, #6 Exhibit E - Email dated 06/21/2020, #7 Exhibit F - Email thread, #8 Exhibit G - Email dated 08/05/10, #9 Exhibit H - News 5 Article, #10 Exhibit I - Article dated 02/25/17, #11 Exhibit J - Designation of Treasurer, #12 Exhibit K - The Review Article, #13 Exhibit L - Article dated 11/12/20, #14 Exhibit M - Article dated 06/06/21, #15 Exhibit N - Letter to Attorney, #16 Exhibit O - Prosecution Definition, #17 Exhibit P - Legal Sources for Media, #18 Exhibit Q - Letter dated 09/26/16, #19 Proposed Summons, #20 Cover letter, #21 Envelope) (M,MT)
June 8, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (M,MT)
June 8, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. Kasaris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Fioritto
Represented By: Amy K. Herman
Represented By: James A. Climer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Gareau, Jr.
Represented By: Amy K. Herman
Represented By: James A. Climer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Gordillo
Represented By: Amy K. Herman
Represented By: James A. Climer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian A. Billiak
Represented By: David Cooper Comstock, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob P. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kasaris
Represented By: David Cooper Comstock, Jr.
Represented By: Jacob P. Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?