Kallsen, et al v. Viacom CBS Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Kallsen and Lee Kallsen
Defendant: Gould Electronics Inc., SPX Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The, Honeywell International, Inc., Carrier Corporation, McNeil & NRM, Inc., Southern Talc Company, York International Corporation, Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Goulds Pumps LLC, John Crane, Inc., Flowserve (US), Inc., FMC Corporation, Red Seal Electric Company, RMS Equipment, LLC, Nidec Minster Corporation, ViacomCBS Inc., Rexnord Industries, LLC, Eaton Corporation, The Ajax Manufacturing Co., IMO Industries, Inc., Viacom CBS Inc., Gould Electronics, Inc., Worthington Pump, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp., Westinghouse Electric Corp., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Carrier Corporation a Division of United Technologies Building & Industrial Systems a Unit of United Technologies Corp., FMC Corporation individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Stearns Electric Corporation doing business as FMC Stearns Brake Division, Flowserve Corporation, Minster Machine Company, Allied Corporation, Successor to Allied Signal, Inc. and Bendix Corporation, Ajax Manufacturing Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, General Electric Corporation, Danly Machine Corporation, Square D Company, York International Corp., ITE Circuit Breaker Co., Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp., Rockbestos Company, Durabla Manufacturing Company, Foster Wheel Energy Corporation, DeLaval, Inc., Worthington Corp., ITT Gould Pumps, Farrel Corporation, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., John Does and ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation
Cross Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc., Clark Industrial Insulation Co., A.W. Chesterton Company, McNeil (Ohio) Corporation, Rubber City Machinery Corp., ABB, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Connell Limited Partnership, Elliott Company, Ecodyne MRM LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, DCo LLC, Ajax Magnethermic Corporation, Pneumo Abex LLC and Crane Company
Cross Claimant: Honeywell International Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01180
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 118 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand filed by ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation. Related document(s) #108 . (Sommers, Sandra)
August 12, 2021 Filing 117 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand filed by John Crane, Inc.. Related document(s) #108 . (Sommers, Sandra)
August 11, 2021 Filing 116 Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Cross-Claims and 3rd-Party Claims (present and future) filed by Carrier Corporation. Related document(s) #108 . (Manno, Joseph) Modified to correct filer on 8/11/2021 (O,K).
August 10, 2021 Filing 115 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, including all Amended Complaints, Cross-Claims, and Third-Party Claims (present and future) filed by A.W. Chesterton Company. Related document(s) #108 . (Winkler, Ryan)
August 5, 2021 Filing 114 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims, and Jury Demand filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Related document(s) #108 . (Schuster, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 113 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Related document(s) #108 . (Schuster, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 112 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims, and Jury Demand filed by Michelin North America, Inc.. Related document(s) #108 . (Schuster, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 111 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims, and Jury Demand filed by RMS Equipment, LLC. Related document(s) #108 . (Schuster, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 110 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims and Jury Demand filed by Dana Corporation. Related document(s) #108 . (Schuster, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 109 Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Answer to Cross-Claims, and Jury Demand filed by Viacom CBS Inc.. Related document(s) #108 . (Schuster, Richard)
August 5, 2021 Filing 108 Amended complaint against A.W. Chesterton Company, ABB, Inc., ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Ajax Magnethermic Corporation, Ajax Manufacturing Company, Carrier Corporation a Division of United Technologies Building & Industrial Systems a Unit of United Technologies Corp., Clark Industrial Insulation Co., Crane Company, Dana Corporation, John Does, Durabla Manufacturing Company, Eaton Corporation, Ecodyne MRM LLC, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Elliott Company, FMC Corporation, Farrel Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, General Electric Corporation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Gould Electronics, Inc., Goulds Pumps LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Gould Pumps, John Crane, Inc., McNeil & NRM, Inc., McNeil (Ohio) Corporation, Michelin North America, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, RMS Equipment, LLC, RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC, Red Seal Electric Company, Rexnord Industries, LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rubber City Machinery Corp., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Southern Talc Company, Square D Company, Stanley Black & Decker, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Viacom CBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Worthington Pump, York International Corp. and adding new party plaintiff(s) MARY LOU KALLSEN, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Lee E. Kallsen. Filed by Lee Kallsen, Mary Kallsen. (Acton, Shawn)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order Plaintiff's Joint Motion for Dismissal of Defendant Nidec Minster Corporation Without Prejudice is granted. Defendant Minster, only, is hereby dismissed, without prejudice, with each party to bear their own fees and costs. (Related Doc #106 ) Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/5/2021.(K,K)
August 4, 2021 Filing 106 Joint Motion to dismiss party Defendant Nidec Minster Corporation fka The Minster Machine Company Without Prejudice filed by Defendant Nidec Minster Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Defendant Nidec Minster Corporation fka The Minster Machine Company Without Prejudice)(Kline, James)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to substitute party and for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Instanter (Related Doc #104 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/4/2021.(K,K)
August 3, 2021 Filing 104 Motion to substitute party and for Leave to File An Amended Complaint Instanter filed by Lee Kallsen, Mary Kallsen. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Acton, Shawn)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney Aric J. Stano removed from case. (Related Doc #17 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/30/2021.(K,K)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney; attorney William J. Witte removed from case. (Related Doc #62 ) Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/30/2021.(K,K)
July 27, 2021 Filing 103 Reply to response to #101 Motion to remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 filed by Mary Kallsen. (Acton, Shawn)
July 19, 2021 Filing 102 Response to #101 Motion to remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 filed by Viacom CBS Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Preliminary Product Identification Disclosure, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from Lee Kallsen Deposition)(Schuster, Richard)
July 14, 2021 Filing 101 Motion to remand to State Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 filed by Lee Kallsen, Mary Kallsen. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint Brochure, #4 Exhibit 3 - Service of Process Certified Mail Delivery Confirmation, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Appearance filed by Westinghouse, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #8 Exhibit 7 - Westinghouse's Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #9 Appendix Unreported Case)(Acton, Shawn)
July 13, 2021 Filing 100 Answer to Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to Cross-claims filed by Crane Company. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 13, 2021 Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Red Seal Electric Company. (Kristan, John)
July 13, 2021 Filing 98 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Red Seal Electric Company. (Kristan, John)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #97 the parties' Joint Motion for extension of time until September 9, 2021 to comply with Court's June 24, 2021 Order. Per the Court's June 24, 2021 Order, the parties are to confer and file a joint report agreeing to one of the three options: 1) the parties consent to this case being remanded to state court; 2) the parties consent to the jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg, or 3) the parties shall file an agreed upon litigation schedule. The parties shall file the joint report informing the Court as to which of the three options are agreeable, no later than September 9, 2021, at noon EST. If the parties agree to litigate this case in federal court, whether on the Court's docket or Judge Greenberg's docket, the parties shall include in the report an agreed-upon discovery deadline to promptly conduct the necessary discovery on the military contractor defense and then ViacomCBS shall file a Motion for Summary Judgment on that issue. Should Judge Greenberg or I grant the Motion for Summary Judgment, the case will be remanded. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/12/21.(P,R)
July 9, 2021 Filing 97 Joint Motion for extension of time until September 9, 2021 to comply with Court's June 24, 2021 Order filed by Lee Kallsen, Mary Kallsen. (Kelley, Edward)
July 8, 2021 Filing 96 Answer on Behalf of its Former Northern Pump Business filed by FMC Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan) s/ by Matthew O'Connell. Modified text on 7/12/2021 (S,SR).
July 8, 2021 Filing 95 Answer with Regard to its Stearns Business filed by Rexnord Industries, LLC. (Studeny, Nathan) s/ by Matthew O'Connell. Modified text on 7/12/2021 (S,SR).
July 8, 2021 Filing 94 Answer of Defendant Eaton Corporation Named Individually and as Successor-in-Interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc. filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
July 7, 2021 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by York International Corp.. (Lopez, M.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 92 Attorney Appearance by M. Laura Lopez filed by on behalf of York International Corp.. (Lopez, M.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goulds Pumps LLC. (Lopez, M.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 90 Attorney Appearance by M. Laura Lopez filed by on behalf of Goulds Pumps LLC. (Lopez, M.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Elliott Company. (Lopez, M.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 88 Attorney Appearance by M. Laura Lopez filed by on behalf of Elliott Company. (Lopez, M.)
July 7, 2021 Filing 87 Notice of Service of Discovery Responses filed by RMS Equipment, LLC. (Schuster, Richard)
July 7, 2021 Filing 86 Answer filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Cozza, Piero)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to dismiss Connell Limited Partnership without prejudice. (Related Doc #84 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/7/21.(P,R)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Joint Motion to dismiss Danly Machine Corporation without prejudice (Related Doc #85 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/7/21.(P,R)
July 2, 2021 Filing 85 Joint Motion to dismiss Danly Machine Corporation filed by Defendant Danly Machine Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brondou, Derek)
July 2, 2021 Filing 84 Joint Motion to dismiss party Connell Limited Partnership filed by Defendant Connell Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brondou, Derek)
July 1, 2021 Filing 83 Answer to Complaint filed by Ajax Magnethermic Corporation. (Floyd, Mark)
June 30, 2021 Filing 82 Attorney Appearance by Melanie M. Irwin filed by on behalf of ABB, Inc.. (Irwin, Melanie)
June 30, 2021 Filing 81 Attorney Appearance by Melanie M. Irwin filed by on behalf of Honeywell International Inc.. (Irwin, Melanie)
June 30, 2021 Filing 80 Answer to Complaint , Crossclaim against All Defendants filed by ABB, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
June 30, 2021 Filing 79 Answer to Complaint , Crossclaim against All Defendants filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christopher G. Conley for Viacom CBS Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #61 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/30/21.(W,CM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney M. Laura Lopez for Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, York International Corp.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #78 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/30/21.(W,CM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Melanie M. Irwin for Honeywell International, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #72 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/30/21.(W,CM)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Melanie M. Irwin for ABB, Inc.. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #73 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/30/21.(W,CM)
June 28, 2021 Filing 78 Motion for attorney M. Laura Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 14660132395, filed by Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps LLC, York International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Letter of Good Standing, #3 Cover Letter) (R,AP)
June 28, 2021 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RMS Equipment, LLC. (Schuster, Richard)
June 25, 2021 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation. (Sommers, Sandra)
June 25, 2021 Filing 75 Answer and Affirmative Defenses Amended Complaint and to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed, filed by ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation. (Sommers, Sandra)
June 25, 2021 Filing 74 Motion for leave to file Answer to Amended Complaint filed by ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer to Amended Complaint)(Sommers, Sandra)
June 25, 2021 Filing 73 Motion for attorney Melanie M. Irwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10902622, filed by Defendant ABB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Good Standing Cert., #2 Proposed Order Order)(Blackmer, Steven) Modified text not a duplicate on 6/29/2021 (O,K).
June 25, 2021 Filing 72 Motion for attorney Melanie M. Irwin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10902552, filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Cert)(Blackmer, Steven)
June 25, 2021 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Company. (Smallwood, Edward)
June 25, 2021 Filing 70 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney John Bruni and adding attorney Edward A. Smallwood, II and Cathy Gordon filed by on behalf of Crane Company. (Smallwood, Edward) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (S,SR).
June 24, 2021 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement: is a wholly owned subsidiary of Electrolux North America, Inc. Electrolux North America, Inc., an Ohio corporation, is a wholly owned subsidiary of AB Electrolux, a company organized under the laws of Sweden. AB Electrolux is a publicly traded company on the Stockholm and London stock exchanges. AB Electrolux is not traded on any US stock exchange. filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Cozza, Piero) Modified text on 7/2/2021 (S,SR).
June 24, 2021 Filing 68 Attorney Appearance by Piero Cozza and Derek Brondou filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Cozza, Piero)
June 24, 2021 Filing 67 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Southern Talc Company. (Martillotta, Samuel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 66 Attorney Appearance by Samuel R. Martillotta filed by on behalf of Southern Talc Company. (Martillotta, Samuel)
June 24, 2021 Minutes of proceedings[non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. On June 23, 2021, the Court held a Zoom teleconference attended by: Plaintiff's counsel Edward J. Kelley, III; Defendant representative Susan Squire Box (McNeil (Ohio) Corporation); Defendant Representative Brendan P. Kelley (Ecodyne MRM LLC); Defendant representative Mark Floyd (Ajax Magnethermic Corporation); Defendant representatives Richard D. Schuster and Stephen C. Musilli (Viacom CBS Inc. ); Defendant representative Brooke L. Hamilton (IMO Industries, Inc.); Defendant representative Christopher J. Caryl (Pneumo Abex Corporation); Defendant Representative Jenifer E. Novak (Schneider Electric USA, Inc.); Defendant representative James N. Kline (Air & Liquid Systems Corporation); Defendant representative Michael P. Quinlan (Southern Talc Company); Defendant representative Nathan F. Studeny (FMC Corporation); and Defendant representative Sandra B. Sommers (John Crane, Inc.); The Court discussed Plaintiffs' Complaint and Mr. Kallsens condition. Plaintiffs' counsel informed the Court that he may be filing an opposition to the removal of this case. Defendant ViacomCBS responded to Plaintiffs' counsel statement and provided the Court with its justification for the timeliness of the removal. The Court informed the parties that it appears Defendant ViacomCBS's justification is sufficient, given the timeframe Plaintiffs disclosed pertinent facts that would be necessary to determine whether removal is appropriate. Given that many of the defendants have not entered an appearance yet, the Court instructed the parties to confer and file a joint report agreeing to one of the three options: 1) the parties consent to this case being remanded to state court; 2) the parties consent to the jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg, or 3) the parties shall file an agreed upon litigation schedule. The Court instructed the parties to file the joint report addressing which of the three options are agreeable, no later than July 9, 2021, at noon EST. If the parties agree to litigate this case in federal court, whether on the Court's docket or Judge Greenberg's docket, the parties shall include in the report an agreed-upon discovery deadline to promptly conduct the necessary discovery on the military contractor defense and then ViacomCBS shall file a Motion for Summary Judgment on that issue. Should Judge Greenberg or I grant the Motion for Summary Judgment, the case will be remanded. Nothing further was scheduled. Time: 30 minutes. (W,CM)
June 22, 2021 Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
June 22, 2021 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ABB, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
June 22, 2021 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ajax Magnethermic Corporation. (Floyd, Mark)
June 22, 2021 Filing 62 Motion by William J. Witte to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Ajax Magnethermic Corporation. (Floyd, Mark)
June 22, 2021 Notice to Attorney John W. Bruni. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
June 22, 2021 Notice to Attorney Thomas J. Burns. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
June 22, 2021 Notice to Attorney M. Laura Lopez. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 61 Motion for attorney Christopher G. Conley to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing and Proposed Order. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-10893283, filed by Defendant Viacom CBS Inc.. (Schuster, Richard)
June 21, 2021 Filing 60 Attorney Appearance by Steven G. Blackmer filed by on behalf of ABB, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
June 21, 2021 Filing 59 Attorney Appearance by Steven G. Blackmer filed by on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc.. (Blackmer, Steven)
June 21, 2021 Filing 58 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Schneider Electric USA, In.. (Novak, Jenifer)
June 21, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by FMC Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 56 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Hamilton, Brooke)
June 21, 2021 Filing 55 Notice of Service of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Admission to Each Named Defendant, Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories to Each Named Defendant, and Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to Each Named Defendant filed by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Hamilton, Brooke)
June 21, 2021 Filing 54 Attorney Appearance by Brooke L. Hamilton filed by on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. (Hamilton, Brooke)
June 21, 2021 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Novak, Jenifer)
June 21, 2021 Filing 52 Attorney Appearance by Jenifer E. Novak filed by on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Novak, Jenifer)
June 21, 2021 Filing 51 Answer filed by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Caryl, Christopher)
June 21, 2021 Filing 50 Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Caryl and Ryan T. Winkler filed by on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC. (Caryl, Christopher)
June 21, 2021 Filing 49 Answer filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Holder, Sarena)
June 21, 2021 Filing 48 Attorney Appearance by Sarena M. Holder filed by on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Holder, Sarena)
June 21, 2021 Filing 47 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 46 Answer filed by RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 45 Attorney Appearance by Laura Hong and Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC. (Kelley, Brendan) Modified on 7/1/2021 (S,SR).
June 21, 2021 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ecodyne MRM LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 43 Answer filed by Ecodyne MRM LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 42 Attorney Appearance by Laura Hong and Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of Ecodyne MRM LLC. (Kelley, Brendan) Modified on 7/1/2021 (S,SR).
June 21, 2021 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ajax Manufacturing Company. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 40 Attorney Appearance by John P. Patterson and Ryan T. Winkler filed by on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company. (Winkler, Ryan) Modified on 7/1/2021 (S,SR).
June 21, 2021 Filing 39 Answer filed by Ajax Manufacturing Company. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Service of Notice of Service of Southern Talc Company's Responses to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests filed by Southern Talc Company. (Quinlan, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Laura Hong and Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of Ajax Manufacturing Company. (Kelley, Brendan) Modified on 7/1/2021 (S,SR).
June 21, 2021 Filing 36 Answer filed by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Winkler, Ryan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 34 Answer filed by Flowserve Corporation. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 33 Attorney Appearance by Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of Flowserve Corporation. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 31 Answer filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 30 Attorney Appearance by Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Service of Defendant Eaton Corporation's Discovery Responses filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Gould Electronics, Inc.. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 27 Answer filed by Gould Electronics, Inc.. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 26 Attorney Appearance by Brendan P. Kelley filed by on behalf of Gould Electronics, Inc.. (Kelley, Brendan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 25 Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Cross-Claims, and Third-Party Claims (Present and Future) filed by Carrier Corporation a Division of United Technologies Building & Industrial Systems a Unit of United Technologies Corp.. (Manno, Joseph)
June 21, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Sommers, Sandra)
June 21, 2021 Filing 23 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant John Crane Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed, filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Sommers, Sandra)
June 21, 2021 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nidec Minster Corporation. (Kline, James)
June 21, 2021 Filing 21 Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Nidec Minster Corporation fka The Minster Machine Company to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and to Any Cross-Claims Filed or to be Filed filed by Nidec Minster Corporation. (Kline, James)
June 21, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Eaton Corporation. (Studeny, Nathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rexnord Industries, LLC. (Studeny, Nathan)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Service of Discovery Responses filed by Michelin North America, Inc.. (Doran, Perry)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 Motion by Aric Stano to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Rubber City Machinery Corp. (McKinzie, Timothy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rubber City Machinery Corp.. (McKinzie, Timothy)
June 21, 2021 IMPORTANT: Corrected Notice [non-document] of Zoom Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 3:30 PM. Only plaintiff and Defendant Westinghouse are required to attend. All other counsel can attend, but their participation is not required. Zoom instructions will be provided. (P,R)
June 18, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Pentair PLC filed by McNeil (Ohio) Corporation. (Box, Susan) Modified to add other affiliate on 6/21/2021 (S,He).
June 18, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Southern Talc Company. (Quinlan, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pneumo Abex Corporation. (Winkler, Ryan)
June 18, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by A.W. Chesterton Company. (Winkler, Ryan)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Rockwell International Corp.. (Holder, Sarena)
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Carrier Corporation a Division of United Technologies Building & Industrial Systems a Unit of United Technologies Corp.. (Manno, Joseph)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Doran, Perry)
June 17, 2021 Notice [non-document] of Zoom teleconference set for 6/24/2021 at 3:30 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Only Plaintiff and Defendant Westinghouse are required to attend. All other counsel may attend, but their participation is not required. Zoom instructions will be provided. Modified on 6/21/2021 (P,R).
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Michelin North America, Inc.. (Doran, Perry)
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Dana Corporation. (Doran, Perry)
June 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Viacom CBS Inc.. (Doran, Perry)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,MT)
June 15, 2021 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (M,MT)
June 15, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)
June 15, 2021 Notice by Clerk that Viacom CBS, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (M,MT)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number 942498 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $402.00, receipt number AOHNDC-10882827. Filed by Viacom CBS Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A to Z to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibits AA to ZZ to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibits AAA to MMM to Notice of Removal). (Doran, Perry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kallsen, et al v. Viacom CBS Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Michelin North America, Inc.
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Clark Industrial Insulation Co.
Represented By: John A. Kristan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: John P. Patterson
Represented By: John B. Patterson
Represented By: Ryan T. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McNeil (Ohio) Corporation
Represented By: Moira H. Pietrowski
Represented By: Susan Squire Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Rubber City Machinery Corp.
Represented By: Aric J. Stano
Represented By: Timothy D. McKinzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph D. Silvaggio
Represented By: Melanie M. Irwin
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James N. Kline
Represented By: Kurt S. Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Sarena M. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Connell Limited Partnership
Represented By: Derek M. Brondou
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Represented By: Thomas J. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: M. Laura Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ecodyne MRM LLC
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: RSCC Wire & Cable, LLC
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DCo LLC
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ajax Magnethermic Corporation
Represented By: Mark E. Floyd
Represented By: William J. Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Caryl
Represented By: Ryan T. Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Cathy R. Gordon
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood, II
Represented By: John W. Bruni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie M. Irwin
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNeil & NRM, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Brooke L. Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Talc Company
Represented By: Michael P. Quinlan
Represented By: Samuel R. Martillotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: Colleen C. Murnane
Represented By: Jenifer E. Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: M. Laura Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra Becher Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve (US), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Seal Electric Company
Represented By: John A. Kristan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMS Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nidec Minster Corporation
Represented By: James N. Kline
Represented By: Kurt S. Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rexnord Industries, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: James L. McCrystal, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ajax Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Michalec
Represented By: Brooke L. Hamilton
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS Inc.
Represented By: Christopher G. Conley
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Pump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher G. Conley
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc., Successor by Merger to CBS Corp.
Represented By: Christopher G. Conley
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Represented By: Christopher G. Conley
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Derek M. Brondou
Represented By: Piero P. Cozza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation a Division of United Technologies Building & Industrial Systems a Unit of United Technologies Corp.
Represented By: John P. Patterson
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Arko
Represented By: Joseph A. Manno
Represented By: Riley Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation individually and as Successor-in-Interest to the Stearns Electric Corporation doing business as FMC Stearns Brake Division
Represented By: James L. McCrystal, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan F. Studeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minster Machine Company
Represented By: James N. Kline
Represented By: Kurt S. Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Corporation, Successor to Allied Signal, Inc. and Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Melanie M. Irwin
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajax Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Represented By: Richard D. Schuster
Represented By: Stephen C. Musilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Corporation
Represented By: Perry W. Doran, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danly Machine Corporation
Represented By: Derek M. Brondou
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Represented By: Thomas J. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: Colleen C. Murnane
Represented By: Jenifer E. Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corp.
Represented By: M. Laura Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITE Circuit Breaker Co.
Represented By: Joseph D. Silvaggio
Represented By: Melanie M. Irwin
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos-Suprenant Cable Corp.
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockbestos Company
Represented By: Brendan P. Kelley
Represented By: Laura K. Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durabla Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheel Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeLaval, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worthington Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Gould Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farrel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Black & Decker, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME Engineering & Manufacturing Corporation
Represented By: Sandra Becher Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Kallsen
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Kallsen
Represented By: Edward J. Kelley, III
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Joyce Chambers Reichard
Represented By: Shawn M. Acton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Blackmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?