Viola v. Cuyahoga County Land Bank, et al
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Viola
Defendant: Master Commissioner Donald J. DeSanto, U.S. Bank Home Mortgage, Mark S. Bennett, U.S. Department of Justice, Cuyahoga County Land Bank, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal National Mortgage Association and Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01196
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Motion to dismiss and Menorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp.. (Schooler, Scott)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #21 Motion for extension of time until 09/22/21 to file response/reply to #12 Motion to dismiss. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/12/2021.(W,CM)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion for extension of time until 09/22/21 to file response to #12 Motion to dismiss filed by Plaintiff Anthony L. Viola. Related document(s) #12 . (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (R,AP)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to dismiss party filed by Defendant Donald J. DeSanto. Related document(s) #1 . (Jacob, Timothy)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Federal National Mortgage Association on 7/7/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed by Anthony L. Viola (Related document(s) #2 ). (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (H,SP)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp.. (O'Connor, Gregory)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Amended Notice of Service of Notices of Appearance filed by Mark S. Bennett, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Related document(s) #16 , #13 , #15 , #14 .(Bennett, James)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Service of Notices of Appearance filed by Mark S. Bennett, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. Related document(s) #13 , #15 , #14 .(Bennett, James)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Attorney Appearance by Ruchi V. Asher filed by on behalf of Mark S. Bennett, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Asher, Ruchi)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by Renee A. Bacchus filed by on behalf of Mark S. Bennett, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Bacchus, Renee)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by James R. Bennett, II filed by on behalf of Mark S. Bennett, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Bennett, James)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss with brief in support Motion to Dismiss with brief in support with Exhibit 1, copy of the docket. Exhibit 2, Judgment Entry. Exhibit 3, Confirmation Entry, filed by Defendant Federal National Mortgage Association. (Deighton, Eric) Modified on 7/30/2021 to correct event (H,SP).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Deighton, Eric)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Eric T. Deighton filed by on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association. (Deighton, Eric)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp.. (Schooler, Scott)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Attorney Appearance by Scott H. Schooler filed by on behalf of Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp.. (Schooler, Scott)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for leave to Plead filed by Defendant Donald J. DeSanto. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jacob, Timothy)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant Donald J. DeSanto's Unopposed Motion for leave to Plead #7 . Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/14/2021.(P,K)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice by Clerk that Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,Ja)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Motion for extension of time until August 13, 2021 to answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to Quiet Title filed by Defendant Cuyahoga County Land Bank. Related document(s) #1 . (Dibo, Nathalie)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #6 Defendant's Motion for extension of time until August 13, 2021 to answer Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to Quiet Title. Cuyahoga County Land Bank answer due 8/13/2021. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/12/2021.(P,K)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Cuyahoga County Land Bank on 6/23/2021, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Anthony L. Viola Related document(s) #3 , #2 . (W,CM)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Return of Service by certified executed upon U.S. Attorney on 6/23/2021, marked C-19 filed on behalf of Anthony L. Viola Related document(s) #2 , #3 . (W,CM)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Mark S. Bennett on 6/23/2021; Donald J. DeSanto on 6/25/2021; U.S. Bank Home Mortgage on 6/25/2021, filed on behalf of Anthony L. Viola Related document(s) #2 . (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(W,CM)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form mailed to Plaintiff at 2820 Mayfield Road Apartment #205, Cleveland Heights, OH 44118 for service upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Complaint against all Defendants. Filing fee paid. $402.00. Receipt #14660132175. Filed by Anthony L. Viola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Lean, #3 Exhibit B - Owed Restitution, #4 Exhibit C - Common Pleas Docket, #5 Exhibit D - Cuyahoga County Cash Account Regsiter, #6 Exhibit E - Unclassified Document, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Envelope) (M,MT)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (M,MT)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viola v. Cuyahoga County Land Bank, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Commissioner Donald J. DeSanto
Represented By: Timothy J. Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark S. Bennett
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Represented By: Ruchi V. Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Represented By: Ruchi V. Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Land Bank
Represented By: Cynthia P. McNamee
Represented By: Gregory B. O'Connor
Represented By: Nathalie A. Dibo
Represented By: Scott H. Schooler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: James R. Bennett, II
Represented By: Renee A. Bacchus
Represented By: Ruchi V. Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Eric T. Deighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Land Reutilization Corp.
Represented By: Cynthia P. McNamee
Represented By: Gregory B. O'Connor
Represented By: Nathalie A. Dibo
Represented By: Scott H. Schooler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?