White et al v. Rite Aid Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Andrew White, Mark Rosenberg, United States of America, Ann Wegelin and Commonwealth of Virginia
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Florida, Inc., Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc., Rite Aid of Illinois, Inc., Rite Aid of Indiana, Inc., Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc., RITE AID OF MAINE INC, Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Massachusetts, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of New York, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of South Carolina, Inc., Rite Aid of Tennessee, Inc., Rite Aid of Vermont, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Rite Aid of Washington, D.C., Inc., Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc., Thrifty Payless Inc., Thrifty Corporation, Eckerd Corporation, Maxi Drug North, Inc., Maxi Drug South, L.P., Maxi Drug, Inc., Genovese Drug Stores, Inc., Apex Drug Stores, Inc., Perry Drug Stores, Inc., Brooks Pharmacy, Inc., Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation and Rite Aid of Maine, Inc
Case Number: 1:2021cv01239
Filed: March 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2023 Filing 52 Attorney Appearance by Donald P. Screen filed by Andrew White, Mark Rosenberg, and Ann Wegelin. (Chandra, Subodh) Modified text on 4/28/2023 (S,SR).
April 27, 2023 Filing 51 Attorney Appearance by Subodh Chandra filed by Andrew White, Mark Rosenberg, and Ann Wegelin. (Chandra, Subodh) Modified text on 4/28/2023 (S,SR).
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Zachary C. Schaengold removed from case. (Related Doc #50 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 4/6/2023. (M,CE)
April 5, 2023 Filing 50 Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel filed by Mark Rosenberg, Ann Wegelin, Andrew White. (Schaengold, Zachary)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney John Maloy for Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #42 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 4/3/2023. (S,SR)
March 31, 2023 Filing 49 Amended Affidavit/Declaration of John Maloy in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. Related document(s) #42 . (Finer, Daniel)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kelly A. Moore for Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #41 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/30/2023.(S,SR)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Eric W. Sitarchuk for Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #40 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/30/2023.(S,SR)
March 28, 2023 Filing 48 Amended Affidavit/Declaration of Kelly Moore in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. Related document(s) #41 . (Finer, Daniel)
March 28, 2023 Filing 47 Amended Affidavit/Declaration of Eric Sitarchuk in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. Related document(s) #40 . (Finer, Daniel)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulation and Order. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/27/2023. Related Document #44 . (S,SR)
March 24, 2023 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Rite Aid Hdqtrs., Corp.; Rite Aid Corporation; Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc.; Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc.; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.; Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc.; Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc.; Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc.; Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.; Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc.; and Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., waivers sent on 3/13/2023, answer due 5/12/2023, filed on behalf of United States of America. (S,HR)
March 24, 2023 Filing 44 Joint Proposed Stipulation and [Proposed Order] regarding responsive pleadings schedule filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Finer, Daniel)
March 21, 2023 Filing 43 Attorney Appearance by Christopher G. Wilson filed by on behalf of United States of America. (Wilson, Christopher)
March 17, 2023 Filing 42 Motion for attorney John Maloy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11900969, filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of J. Maloy In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Text of Proposed Order)(Finer, Daniel)
March 17, 2023 Filing 41 Motion for attorney Kelly Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11900962, filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of K. Moore In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Text of Proposed Order)(Finer, Daniel)
March 17, 2023 Filing 40 Motion for attorney Eric Sitarchuk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11900934, filed by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of E. Sitarchuk In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Text of Proposed Order)(Finer, Daniel)
March 17, 2023 Filing 39 Attorney Appearance by Daniel M. Finer filed by on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Finer, Daniel)
March 13, 2023 Filing 38 Complaint with jury demand in Intervention against Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation, Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc., Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc., Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc., Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc., Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc., Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc... Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Rite Aid Stores) (Fitzgerald, Patricia)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order re #36 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention or Not Intervene at this Time. Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 3/1/2023. (S,SR)
February 23, 2023 Filing 36 Notice of Election to Decline Intervention or Not Intervene at this Time filed by Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howells, Matthew)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Matthew G. Howells for Commonwealth of Virginia. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #35 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 2/22/2023. (S,SR)
February 21, 2023 Filing 35 Motion for attorney Matthew G. Howells to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee paid $120.00, receipt number 143791. Filed by Plaintiff Commonwealth of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney Matthew G. Howells, #2 Envelope)(F,AW)
December 16, 2022 Filing 34 Notice of Correction filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #29 .(Fitzgerald, Patricia)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order: The United States having intervened in this action, the Court rules as follows: 1) The Relators' Complaint, including any Amended Complaints, the Government's Notice of Intervention, and this Order be unsealed; 2) The United States file its Complaint within 90 days, and the United States serve its Complaint, together with a copy of this Order, in accordance with the Fedeal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3) The relators shall serve their Complaint upon Defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure after the United States has filed its Complaint; 4) All other papers or Orders on file in this matter shall remain under seal; 5) The seal shall be lifted on all matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order (Related document(s) #29 ). Judge Charles Esque Fleming on 12/13/2022. (H,SP)
November 18, 2022 Filing 29 Notice of Intervention in Part filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order).(L,MI)
March 17, 2022 Case reassigned to District Judge Charles E. Fleming pursuant to General Order 2022-07. (S,HR)
March 17, 2022 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2202-07. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (S,HR)
June 23, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,L)
June 23, 2021 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (M,L)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 Second Amended Complaint against all defendants filed by Mark Rosenberg, Ann Wegelin, and Andrew White. (S,HR)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against APEX DRUG STORES, INC., BROOKS PHARMACY, INC., ECKERD CORPORATION, GENOVESE DRUG STORES, INC., MAXI DRUG NORTH, INC., MAXI DRUG SOUTH, L.P., MAXI DRUG, INC., PERRY DRUG STORES, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID HEADQUARTERS CORPORATION, RITE AID OF ALABAMA, INC., RITE AID OF CONNECTICUT INC., RITE AID OF DELAWARE, INC., RITE AID OF FLORIDA, INC., RITE AID OF GEORGIA, INC., RITE AID OF ILLINOIS, INC., RITE AID OF INDIANA, INC., RITE AID OF KENTUCKY, INC., RITE AID OF MAINE, INC., RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., RITE AID OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., RITE AID OF MICHIGAN, INC., RITE AID OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC., RITE AID OF NEW JERSEY, INC., RITE AID OF NEW YORK, INC., RITE AID OF OHIO, INC., RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., RITE AID OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., RITE AID OF TENNESSEE, INC., RITE AID OF VERMONT, INC., RITE AID OF VIRGINIA, INC., RITE AID OF WASHINGTON, D.C., INC., RITE AID OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC., THRIFTY CORPORATION, THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC., filed by MARK ROSENBERG, ANDREW WHITE, ANN WEGELIN.(lisad, ) [Transferred from paed on 6/23/2021.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint against all defendants filed by Mark Rosenberg, Ann Wegelin, and Andrew White. (S,HR)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against APEX DRUG STORES, INC., BROOKS PHARMACY, INC., ECKERD CORPORATION, GENOVESE DRUG STORES, INC., MAXI DRUG NORTH, INC., MAXI DRUG SOUTH, L.P., MAXI DRUG, INC., PERRY DRUG STORES, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF ALABAMA, INC., RITE AID OF CONNECTICUT INC., RITE AID OF DELAWARE, INC., RITE AID OF FLORIDA, INC., RITE AID OF GEORGIA, INC., RITE AID OF ILLINOIS, INC., RITE AID OF INDIANA, INC., RITE AID OF KENTUCKY, INC., RITE AID OF MAINE, INC., RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., RITE AID OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., RITE AID OF MICHIGAN, INC., RITE AID OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC., RITE AID OF NEW JERSEY, INC., RITE AID OF NEW YORK, INC., RITE AID OF OHIO, INC., RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., RITE AID OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., RITE AID OF TENNESSEE, INC., RITE AID OF VERMONT, INC., RITE AID OF VIRGINIA, INC., RITE AID OF WASHINGTON, D.C., INC., RITE AID OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC., THRIFTY CORPORATION, THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC., RITE AID HEADQUARTERS CORPORATION filed by MARK ROSENBERG, ANDREW WHITE, ANN WEGELIN.(tjd) [Transferred from paed on 6/23/2021.]
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against all defendants filed by Mark Rosenberg, Ann Wegelin, Andrew White. (S,HR)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APEX DRUG STORES, INC., BROOKS PHARMACY, INC., ECKERD CORPORATION, GENOVESE DRUG STORES, INC., MAXI DRUG NORTH, INC., MAXI DRUG SOUTH, L.P., MAXI DRUG, INC., PERRY DRUG STORES, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, RITE AID OF ALABAMA, INC., RITE AID OF CONNECTICUT INC., RITE AID OF DELAWARE, INC., RITE AID OF FLORIDA, INC., RITE AID OF GEORGIA, INC., RITE AID OF ILLINOIS, INC., RITE AID OF INDIANA, INC., RITE AID OF KENTUCKY, INC., RITE AID OF MAINE, INC., RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., RITE AID OF MASSACHUSETTS, INC., RITE AID OF MICHIGAN, INC., RITE AID OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, INC., RITE AID OF NEW JERSEY, INC., RITE AID OF NEW YORK, INC., RITE AID OF OHIO, INC., RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., RITE AID OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., RITE AID OF TENNESSEE, INC., RITE AID OF VERMONT, INC., RITE AID OF VIRGINIA, INC., RITE AID OF WASHINGTON, D.C., INC., RITE AID OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC., THRIFTY CORPORATION, THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE204556.), filed by MARK ROSENBERG, ANDREW WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(fb) [Transferred from paed on 6/23/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Rite Aid Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew White
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Represented By: William G. Powers
Represented By: Zachary C. Schaengold
Represented By: Donald P. Screen
Represented By: Subodh Chandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Rosenberg
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Represented By: William G. Powers
Represented By: Zachary C. Schaengold
Represented By: Donald P. Screen
Represented By: Subodh Chandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia M. Fitzgerald
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Berry
Represented By: GREGORY B. DAVID
Represented By: Joel M. Sweet
Represented By: Christopher G. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Wegelin
Represented By: W. Scott Simmer
Represented By: William G. Powers
Represented By: Zachary C. Schaengold
Represented By: Donald P. Screen
Represented By: Subodh Chandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Matthew G. Howells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Connecticut, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Georgia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Indiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF MAINE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Massachusetts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New Jersey, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of South Carolina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Tennessee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Washington, D.C., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Payless Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi Drug North, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi Drug South, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi Drug, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genovese Drug Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Drug Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Drug Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Headquarters Corporation
Represented By: Daniel M. Finer
Represented By: Eric W. Sitarchuk
Represented By: John Maloy
Represented By: Kelly A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maine, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?