Nucor Corporation v. Framing Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nucor Corporation
Defendant: Framing Systems, Inc., Kevin Wyman and Trevor Wyman
Case Number: 1:2021cv01734
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order granting Defendants' #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until 11/22/2021 to Answer. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/22/2021. (JLG)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for extension of thirty day time period to answer complaint until 11/21/2021 filed by Framing Systems, Inc., Kevin Wyman, Trevor Wyman. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulated Order)(Fry, Jude) Modified on 10/25/2021 (D,Th).
October 20, 2021 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance of Daniel R. Ling by Jude A. Fry filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Fry, Jude)
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance of Timothy E. Nauman by Jude A. Fry filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Fry, Jude)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 Attorney Appearance by Jude A. Fry filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Fry, Jude)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney J. Mark Wilson for Nucor Corporation. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Related Doc #4 . Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 10/8/2021.(G,M)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Framing Systems, Inc., on 10/1/2021 filed on behalf of Nucor Corporation (Kessler, Marc). Summons was not issued by the Clerk. Modified on 10/18/2021 (D,Th).
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Framing Systems, Inc. on 10/1/2021, filed on behalf of Nucor Corporation (Kessler, Marc). Summons was not issued by the Clerk. Modified on 10/18/2021 (D,Th).
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Kevin Wyman on 10/1/2021, filed on behalf of Nucor Corporation (Kessler, Marc). Summons were not issued by the Clerk. Modified on 10/18/2021 (D,Th).
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Proof of Service by personal service executed upon Trevor Wyman on 10/1/2021, filed on behalf of Nucor Corporation (Kessler, Marc). Summons was not issued by the Clerk. Modified on 10/18/2021 (D,Th).
October 1, 2021 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2021-15. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (V,AR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon All Defendants. (S,SR)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Trevor Wyman, #2 Summons to Kevin Wyman, #3 Summons to Framing Systems, Inc., #4 Summons to Highland Park Service Corporation as Registered Agent for Framing Systems, Inc.)(Kessler, Marc)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Motion for attorney J. Mark Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11052271, filed by Plaintiff Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Kessler, Marc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore no summons issued. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nucor Corporation for Nucor Corporation filed by Nucor Corporation. (Kessler, Marc)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Framing Systems, Inc., Kevin Wyman, Trevor Wyman. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11020482.. Filed by Nucor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 908 Patent, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dynacore System Photographs, #3 Exhibit 3 - CorTek Experience Invitation, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kessler, Marc) Modified on 9/7/2021 (W,CM).
September 7, 2021 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nucor Corporation v. Framing Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nucor Corporation
Represented By: Marc J. Kessler
Represented By: J. Mark Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Framing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Ling
Represented By: Timothy E. Nauman
Represented By: Jude A. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wyman
Represented By: Daniel R. Ling
Represented By: Timothy E. Nauman
Represented By: Jude A. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Wyman
Represented By: Daniel R. Ling
Represented By: Timothy E. Nauman
Represented By: Jude A. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?