Lewis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rachel Lewis
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv01736
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Referring Judge: David A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security. Related document(s) #1 . (Johnson, Lisa)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (G,CA)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/14/2021. (G,CA)
October 14, 2021 Copy of #5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order, #6 Notice of Magistrate Consent form mailed to Rachel Lewis, 24127 Knickerbocker Rd., Bay Village, OH 44140 on 10/14/2021. (G,CA)
October 6, 2021 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge John R. Adams on 10/6/21. (K,C)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 9/24/2021. (G,CA)
September 24, 2021 Copy of #4 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Rachel Lewis, 24127 Knickerbocker Rd., Bay Village, OH 44140 on 9/24/2021. (G,CA)
September 7, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Rachel Lewis. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP... Filed by Rachel Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeals, #2 Order of Appeals, #3 Case Designation) (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Copy of #3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order, #1 NEF of the Notice of Social Security Complaint to the pro se plaintiff, mailed to Rachel Lewis at 24127 Knickerbocker Bay Village, OH 44140 on 9/7/2021. Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,Ja)
September 7, 2021 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Cara Staley Rafferty
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?