Johnson v. Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Plaintiff: Mary Johnson
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Case Number: 1:2021cv01806
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Mary Johnson. (Lalak, Christopher)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference on 11/23/2021 at 09:45 AM to be held telephonically before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Counsel are instructed to first initiate a conference call with all parties connected and then contact the Court. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/1/2021. (M,S)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Mary Johnson. Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021 filed on behalf of Mary Johnson (Lalak, Christopher)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-11047430. Filed by Mary Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Lalak, Christopher)
September 22, 2021 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (M,MT)
September 22, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Johnson
Represented By: Christopher J. Lalak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Reserve Bank of Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?