United States of America v. Varner et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Richard W. Varner, Richard W. Varner, II and Pacific Trader Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01812
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/18/2022 at 1:00 p.m. in Chambers 16B before Judge J. Philip Calabrese. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Rule 26 Report of Parties)(Y,A)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Pacific Trader Ltd.. Pacific Trader Ltd. waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 filed on behalf of Pacific Trader Ltd. (Williams, James)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Richard W. Varner, II waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Richard W. Varner waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
September 23, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Pacific Trader Ltd., Richard W. Varner, II, Richard W. Varner. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Varner, #3 Summons Varner II, #4 Summons Pacific Trader Ltd.) (Bednar, Philip)
September 23, 2021 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (L,MI)
September 23, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Varner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Anderson P. Heston
Represented By: Philip L. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Varner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Varner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Trader Ltd.
Represented By: James M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?