Noco Company v. Reclaimed Assets Group LLC
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Reclaimed Assets Group LLC doing business as RA Group
Case Number: 1:2021cv01833
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 Default Entered on 11/15/2021 against Reclaimed Assets Group LLC. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Kayla Sartschev, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #6 . (S,KM)
November 15, 2021 Copy of #7 Default Entered mailed to Reclaimed Assets Group LLC D/B/A RA Group 40500 Van Born Canton, MI 48188 on 11/15/2021. Related document(s) #7 . (S,KM)
November 12, 2021 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Reclaimed Assets Group, LLC filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit for Entry of Default)(Bullock, Anna)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Reclaimed Assets Group LLC on 10/5/2021, (marked c-19) filed on behalf of Noco Company. Related document(s) #3 . (R,AP)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Noco Company. (Welsh, Alexander)
September 30, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Andrew Fincher placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7021 0350 0000 6441 1495. (R,AP)
September 30, 2021 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Reclaimed Assets Group LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7021 0350 0000 6441 1488. (R,AP)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to Counsel for service upon Reclaimed Assets Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,Ja)
September 28, 2021 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,Ja)
September 28, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (L,Ja)
September 28, 2021 Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the #AO121 Copyright Report Form or #AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 10/8/2021. (L,Ja)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Reclaimed Assets Group LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11054757.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Infringing Listing, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Reclaimed Assets Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Represented By: Alexander M. Welsh
Represented By: Anna Elaine Bullock
Represented By: Derek P. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reclaimed Assets Group LLC doing business as RA Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?