Boyd v. Hill
Petitioner: Cardell Boyd
Respondent: Warden Leon Hill
Case Number: 1:2021cv01935
Filed: October 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Motion for extension of time until 01/07/2022 to answer filed by Respondent Leon Hill. (Criss, M.)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Respondent's #5 Motion for Extension of Time until 01/07/2022 to answer. The Attorney General has until 01/07/2022 to file an answer/return of writ. Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 11/10/21.(M,MT)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause. (Related Doc. #1 ) The Attorney General has 23 days from the date of this order to file an answer/return of writ. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 10/18/21. (copy of order mailed to petitioner and respondent with copy of petition to the respondent and via email to Brian Higgins, Office of Ohio Attorney General on 10/18/21)(D,Ky)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for Report and Recommendation re Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referral shall include the issuance by the Magistrate Judge of any order requiring the respondent to answer, service of the petition or any appropriate order directed to this matter, pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure governing Habeas Corpus cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 10/18/2021. (M,S)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of #3 Order of Referral, mailed to Cardell Boyd A763-016 and Leon Hill, Warden at Marion Correctional Institution P.O. Box 57 Marion, OH 43301 on 10/18/2021. Related document(s) #3 . (M,S)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Copy of #4 Order to Show Cause, mailed to Cardell Boyd A763-016, Marion Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 57, Marion, OH 43301 on 10/18/21. Related document(s) #4 . (D,Ky)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,MT)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee paid. $5.00. Receipt #14660134514. Filed by Cardell Boyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (M,MT)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (M,MT)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,MT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cardell Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Leon Hill
Represented By: M. Scott Criss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?