RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC v. North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, et al
Plaintiff: RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC
Defendant: North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, Joseph C. Moffa, Roman Paich and Cuyahoga County Treasurer
Case Number: 1:2021cv01996
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Stay until 1/1/2022 (Related Doc #16 ). In the event the Stay terminates, Defendant's Answer shall be due no later than 20 days after the date on which the Stay terminates. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/2/2021.(R,Sh)
November 24, 2021 Filing 16 Joint Motion to stay filed by Joseph C. Moffa, North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, Roman Paich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pinney, Jon)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting the Parties' #15 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until November 24, 2021 to file response/reply to #3 Motion for Appointment of Receiver . Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/23/2021.(R,Sh)
November 22, 2021 Filing 15 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until November 24, 2021 to file response/reply to #3 Motion for Appointment of Reciver filed by Joseph C. Moffa, North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, Roman Paich. Related document(s) #3 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pinney, Jon)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #11 Motion for extension of time until November 22, 2021 to file response/reply to Plaintiff's #3 Motion for Receiver. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/19/2021.(R,Sh)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 6, 2021 to answer Joseph C. Moffa answer due 12/6/2021; North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC answer due 12/6/2021; Roman Paich answer due 12/6/2021. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 11/10/2021.(R,Sh)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Cuyahoga County Treasurer. (Grabenstein, Matthew)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 Response to #11 Motion for extension of time until November 22, 2021 to file response/reply to #3 Motion for Appointment of Receiver filed by RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC. (Dunlop, Branson)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until December 6, 2021 to answer filed by Joseph C. Moffa, North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, Roman Paich. (Related document(s) #1 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pinney, Jon s/by John P. Archer). Modified on 11/10/2021, filer notified that s/signature should be same as filer (H,SP).
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 Motion for extension of time until November 22, 2021 to file response/reply to #3 Motion to Appoint Receiver filed by Joseph C. Moffa, North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, Roman Paich. (Related document(s) #3 ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pinney, Jon s/by John P. Archer). Modified on 11/10/2021, filer notified that s/signature should be same as filer (H,SP).
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Cuyahoga County Treasurer on 10/25/2021, filed on behalf of RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC (Dunlop, Branson)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Roman Paich on 10/25/2021, filed on behalf of RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC (Dunlop, Branson)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Joseph C. Moffa on 10/26/2021, filed on behalf of RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC (Dunlop, Branson)
November 1, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service by personal service executed upon North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC on 10/25/2021, filed on behalf of RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC (Dunlop, Branson)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Jon J. Pinney filed by on behalf of Joseph C. Moffa, North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, Roman Paich. (Pinney, Jon)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (M,MT)
October 22, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,MT)
October 22, 2021 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. assigned to case. (M,MT)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent ACRES Commercial Realty Corp. for RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC filed by RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC. (Dunlop, Branson)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Receiver filed by Plaintiff RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Appointing Receiver)(Dunlop, Branson).
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Attorney Appearance by Branson D. Dunlop filed by on behalf of RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC. (Dunlop, Branson)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint for money, judgment, foreclosure of mortgage, and other relief against all defendants. Filing fee paid $402.00, Receipt number AOHNDC-11095580. Filed by RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Promissory Note, #2 Mortgage (Recorded), #3 Legal Description, #4 Assignment of Leases and Rents, #5 UCC-1, #6 Cash Management Agreement, #7 Assignment of Agreements, Permits and Contracts, #8 Collateral Assignment of Interest Rate Cap, #9 Allonge to SPE, #10 Assignment of Mortgage to SPE 4, #11 Assignment of ALR to SPE 4, #12 Assignment of UCC to SPE 4, #13 Allonge to SPE 9, #14 Assignment of Mortgage to SPE 9, #15 Assignment of ALR to SPE 9, #16 Assignment of UCC to SPE 9, #17 Omnibus Amendment and Extension, #18 Mortgage Modification (Recorded), #19 Affidavit of Jaclyn Jesberger, #20 Title Commitment, #21 Guaranty of Recourse Obligations, #22 Amended and Restated Guaranty of Recourse Obligations, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons) (Dunlop, Branson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC v. North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RCC Real Estate SPE 9 LLC
Represented By: Branson D. Dunlop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Olmsted Hotel Group LLC
Represented By: John P. Archer
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Moffa
Represented By: John P. Archer
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roman Paich
Represented By: John P. Archer
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuyahoga County Treasurer
Represented By: Matthew H. Grabenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?