Yee v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lily Yee
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv02067
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Counsel for the parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer. The conference must be done by in-person meeting or by telephonic or video conference no later than the deadline for filing defendant's brief. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 12/21/2021. (W,K)
December 20, 2021 Filing 6 Transcript of Proceedings before the Social Security Administration filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document(s) #1 . (Ina, Rema)
November 9, 2021 Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson assigned to case. pursuant to consent. Judge Pamela A. Barker terminated. Related document(s) #5 . (L,MI)
November 8, 2021 Filing 5 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson for further proceedings signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/8/2021. Related Document #3 (S,KM)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 11/5/2021. (G,M)
November 5, 2021 Filing 3 Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Ina, Rema)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11112743.. Filed by Lily Yee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)
November 2, 2021 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 11/2/2021. (L,MI)
November 2, 2021 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case. (L,MI)
November 2, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (L,MI)
November 2, 2021 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yee v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Yee
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Rema Alberta Ina
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?