Marykay Bowen v. Social Security Commissioner
Plaintiff: Marykay Bowen
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2021cv02206
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Amanda M Knapp
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 2/17/2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Social Security Commissioner. (Johnson, Lisa)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,S)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: The transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1 and this Order. Compliance with all requirements set forth in this Order is expected. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 11/22/2021. (S,S)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 11/19/2021. (L,Ja)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Compliance with L.R. 9.1 filed by Marykay Bowen. (Neilsen, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint against Social Security Commissioner. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11144209. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be a refiling of a previously remanded case 1:18-cv-00179. Filed by Marykay Bowen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Bowen, #2 Summons Summons - Bowen, #3 USM-285 USM 285s - Bowen) (Neilsen, David)
November 19, 2021 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,Ja)
November 19, 2021 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,Ja)
November 19, 2021 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (L,Ja)
November 19, 2021 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 11/19/2021. (L,Ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marykay Bowen v. Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marykay Bowen
Represented By: David F. Neilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?