Barry County v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: Barry County
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Wal Mart Stores, East, LP formerly known as Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. doing business as Walmart #48 Walmart #914 and Walmart #4282, Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Michael Babich, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Does 1 through 1000, Allergan U.S.A., Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Mylan N.V., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East L.P., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, RPCS, Inc. doing business as Price Cutter Pharmacy 5, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Indivior Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, McQueary Bros. Durg Company, LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., SpecGX LLC, John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, Morris & Dickson Co LLC, Walmart Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Par Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sandoz Inc. and Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021op45016
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-01452. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER w/Schedule A attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell,Chair of the Panel (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Exhaustive List of Federal Question Removed Actions)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY (to termed motion) re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Barry County. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conditional Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit B - Camden County Order, #3 Exhibit C - Pike County Stay Order, #4 Exhibit D - Statement of Interest of the United States of America)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE Request for Juducial Notice in Support of Opposition: by Plaintiff Barry County re #15 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Order entered in 4:18-cv-11958, Doc. 36, #2 Exhibit B) Copy of Minutes of Teleconference & Scheduling Order, No: 1:17-md-2804 Doc. 4, #3 Exhibit C) Minutes of Initial Pretrial Conf in No. 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 70, #4 Exhibit D) Order Re Remands in No. 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 130, #5 Exhibit E) CMO One in 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 232, #6 Exhibit F) Transfer Order Entered by Judicial Panel, MDL 2804, Doc. 31, #7 Exhibit G) Order Entered by the Sixth Circuit City of Jacksonville v. Purdue Pharma on Feb. 13, 2019, #8 Exhibit H) Complaint Filed in No. 1:18-op-45936, Doc. 2, #9 Exhibit I) Copy of the North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.'s Request for Oral Argument on its Motion to Remand, #10 Exhibit J) Order Entered No. 1:18-op-46120, Doc. 43, #11 Exhibit K) Notice of Appeal filed in No: 1:17-md-02804, Doc. 1061, #12 Exhibit L) Copy of Pltf's Motion for Hearing Fully-Briefed Motion to Remand filed in 1:17-op-45017, Doc. 43, #13 Exhibit M) Copy of Order Entered in No: 8:18-cv-019747, Doc. 44)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation's Transfer Decision filed by Plaintiff Barry County. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Proposed Order: by Plaintiff Barry County re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis, #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff Barry County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Judge Polster's Order)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Barry County. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. The Moving Defendants motion is GRANTED. 2. Moving Defendants shall not be required to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until sixty (60) days after the later of: (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this Courts ruling on a motion to remand this action to the Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/14/20. (KJS) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Randy J. Soriano for Defendants Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Soriano, Randy) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Barry County.(MFG) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Cardinal Health, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CC09901, with receipt number AMOEDC-8203163, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Exhibit C - Docket sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #5 Attachment A, #6 Attachment B, #7 Attachment C, #8 Original Filing Form with attachment, #9 Attachment A)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 2/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barry County v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart Stores, East, LP formerly known as Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. doing business as Walmart #48 Walmart #914 and Walmart #4282
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 1000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPCS, Inc. doing business as Price Cutter Pharmacy 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McQueary Bros. Durg Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Randy J. Soriano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris & Dickson Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry County
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?