Village Of Addison et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Village Of Bolingbrook, Village of La Grange Park, Village of Forest Park, Village Of Addison, Village Of Schiller Park, City of Kankakee, Village of Franklin Park, Vilalge of Bensenville, City of Streator, Village of McCook, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of Riverside and Village Of Oak Park
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Joseph Giacchino, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International plc, TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Actavis plc, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., William McMahon, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Paul Madison, Normaco Inc, Actavis LLC and Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2021op45018
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 32 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Illinois Northern. Case number 1:20-cv-05534. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 5, 2021 Filing 31 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Ohio the electronic record. (bg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
February 5, 2021 Filing 30 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio. (bg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
February 5, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2804 Conditional Transfer Order filed 2/5/2021. (bg, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY by Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside to motion to remand, #20 (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in Opposition to motion to remand, #20 (Mika, Caitlin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. for leave to file Memorandum in Law in Excess of Fifteen Pages (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Cardinal Health, Inc. in Opposition to motion to remand, #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Having waited nearly five weeks after defendants removed this case to file a motion for remand, plaintiffs now want the briefing schedule expedited. Plaintiffs waited a week after the Court entered a briefing schedule to file a motion to expedite the briefing. The motion to expedite #24 is denied, but plaintiffs are welcome to file their brief before the deadline. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside to expedite briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Plaintiffs' motion for remand to state court #20 is taken under advisement. Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for remand #20 shall be filed by 11/23/20; Plaintiffs' Reply shall be filed by 12/7/20. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file memorandum of law in excess of fifteen pages, instanter #22 is granted. Notice mailed by Judge's staff (lf, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside for leave to file excess pages (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM motion to remand, #20 by City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand to State Court (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside to remand to State Court (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Defendants Mallinckrodt PLC and Mallinckrodt LLC Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy as to Mallinckrodt LLC and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Mallinckrodt LLC (and FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
October 12, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC by Nicholas Martin Berg (Berg, Nicholas) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 DEFENDANTS ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC. AND ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mika, Caitlin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Caitlin Martini Mika (Mika, Caitlin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. for extension of time to File Responsive Pleadings by Consent (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Cardinal Health, Inc. in support of motion to stay #11 Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. to stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside by Michael W Ovca (Ovca, Michael) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs City of Kankakee, City of Streator, Vilalge of Bensenville, Village Of Addison, Village Of Bolingbrook, Village Of Oak Park, Village Of Schiller Park, Village of Forest Park, Village of Franklin Park, Village of Harwood Heights, Village of La Grange Park, Village of McCook, Village of Riverside by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sxb, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Anita Maria Kidd (Kidd, Anita) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Sarah E. Harmon (Harmon, Sarah) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Notification as to Affiliates by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Cardinal Health, Inc. re notice of removal, #1 (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, Chancery Division, case number (2020CH05181) filed by Cardinal Health, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17451031. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Court File, #3 Exhibit C-Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Attachment A, #6 Exhibit Attachment B)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]
September 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 2/10/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Village Of Addison et al v. Cephalon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Martini Mika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Martin Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Giacchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Represented By: Sarah E. Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Caitlin Martini Mika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Normaco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Of Bolingbrook
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of La Grange Park
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Forest Park
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Of Addison
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Of Schiller Park
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Kankakee
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Franklin Park
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vilalge of Bensenville
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Streator
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of McCook
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Harwood Heights
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village of Riverside
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Village Of Oak Park
Represented By: Michael W. Ovca
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin H. Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?