St. Clair County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Plaintiff: St. Clair County, Missouri
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC, King Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Alpharma Pharmaceuticals LLC, Total RX Services, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., John Kapoor, Mylan Institutional Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Mallinckrodt LLC, Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Pfizer Inc, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cardinal Health 201, LLC, Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis plc, Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc., Mylan N.V., Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. formerly doing business as Watson Pharma, Inc., Hospira Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Cardinal Health 5, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Michael Babich, SpecGX LLC, King Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sandoz Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC and H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Case Number: 1:2021op45044
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 4:20-cv-01641. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of Ohio Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 20 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair of the Panel w/Schedule A attached (DLB) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff St. Clair County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) Modified text on 12/28/2020 (CLO). [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiff St. Clair County, Missouri (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) Order entered in No: 4:18-cv-11958, Doc 36, #2 Exhibit B) Copy of Minutes of Teleconference & Scheduling Order, No: 1:17-md-2804 Doc. 4, #3 Exhibit C) Minutes of Initial Pretrial Conf in No. 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 70, #4 Exhibit D) Order Re Remands in No. 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 130, #5 Exhibit E) CMO One in 1:17-md-2804, Doc. 232, #6 Exhibit F) Transfer Order Entered by Judicial Panel, MDL 2804, Doc. 31, #7 Exhibit G) Order Entered by the Sixth Circuit City of Jacksonville v. Purdue Pharma on Feb. 13, 2019, #8 Exhibit H) Complaint Filed in No. 1:18-op-45936, Doc. 2, #9 Exhibit I) Copy of the North Mississippi Medical Center, Inc.'s Request for Oral Argument on its Motion to Remand, #10 Exhibit J) Order Entered No. 1:18-op-46120, Doc. 43, #11 Exhibit K) Notice of Appeal filed in No: 1:17-md-02804, Doc. 1061, #12 Exhibit L) Copy of Pltf's Motion for Hearing Fully-Briefed Motion to Remand filed in 1:17-op-45017, Doc. 43, #13 Exhibit M) Copy of Order Entered in No: 8:18-cv-019747, Doc. 44)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Edgar, John) Modified on docket text 12/14/2020 (CLO). [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Plaintiff St. Clair County, Missouri Proposed Order (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis filed by Plaintiff St. Clair County, Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Judge Polster's Order)(Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to City of St. Louis by Plaintiff St. Clair County, Missouri. (Edgar, John) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay Pending the Judicial Panel on Multi district Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Moving Defendants motion [ECF No. #8 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Moving Defendants shall not be required to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint until sixty (60) days after the later of: (1) a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) granting a motion to vacate a conditional transfer order covering this action or otherwise finally denying transfer of this action; or (2) this Court's ruling on a motion to remand this action to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 12/2/20. (JAB) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (FLJ) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (MFG) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal plaintiff St. Clair County, Missouri as to Pfizer Inc, King Pharmaceuticals LLC, Alpharma Pharmaceuticals LLC and Hospira, Inc. (MFG) Modified text on 11/23/2020 (JAB). [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by St. Clair County, Missouri.(MFG) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc.. Parent companies: Cardinal Health, Inc., Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Julie Fix Meyer for Defendants Cardinal Health 100, Inc., Cardinal Health 108, LLC, Cardinal Health 110, LLC, Cardinal Health 113, LLC, Cardinal Health 122, LLC, Cardinal Health 132, LLC, Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Cardinal Health 201, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Cardinal Health 5, LLC, Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-First Judicial Circuit, case number 20SL-CC05338, with receipt number AMOEDC-8294906, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Cardinal Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - Docket sheet, #5 Exhibit E - Notice, #6 Exhibit F - Order, #7 Civil Cover Sheet with attachments, #8 Attachment A, #9 Attachment B, #10 Attachment C, #11 Original Filing Form with attachments, #12 Attachment A)(Meyer, Julie) [Transferred from moed on 4/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Clair County, Missouri v. Allergan PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpharma Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpharma Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 113, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 201, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 108, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 132, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Buying Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Pharmacy Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 122, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. formerly doing business as Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospira Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 5, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Babich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Clair County, Missouri
Represented By: Terry L. Pabst
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?