Russell, KY et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Plaintiff: City of Russell, KY, City of Jenkins, KY, City of Pineville, KY, City of Worthington, KY, City of Vanceburg, KY, City of Greenup, KY, City of South Shore, KY and City of Bellefonte, KY
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Allergan PLC, Endo International plc, Johnson & Johnson, Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp, KVK Tech, Inc., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Depomed Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Anda Inc, Cardinal Health Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Kroger Company, McKesson Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC, Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc, Walgreens Corporation and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021op45094
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 3:21-cv-00030. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFIED ORDER received from Northern District of Ohio re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO No. 201 filed in MDL Case Number 2804. (JJ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
August 6, 2021 Filing 16 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER 201 re MDL No. 2804 (CBD) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Filing 15 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENTCorporate Disclosure by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Cobb, Joseph) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER : 1. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint #10 is GRANTED; 2.West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., now known as Hika Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.s Motion to Join Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #12 is GRANTED; and 3. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint within thirty days after the later of: (a) this Courts ruling on any motion to remand this case; or (b) a final decision from the Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation on whether to transfer this action to In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, No. 1:17-md-280. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 7/30/2021.(CBD)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc.. (Sparks, Andrew) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Joinder #10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 11 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Dickens, Scott) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 29, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CVS Health Corporation LLC, Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stopher, Robert) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 9 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid of Kentucky, Inc... (Gray, Elisabeth) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 8 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC for West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp... (Kelly, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (White, Jordan) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.. (Kelly, Donald) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Moad, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by McKesson Corporation. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moad, Jeffrey) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC. (Stopher, Robert) Modified text on 7/28/2021 (JJ). [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Clerk's Note re #1 Notice of Removal: MDL Panel and SKV notified via email with a copy of the Notice of Removal and docket sheet. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 26, 2021 Conflict Check run. (JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin Co. Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00515. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5025535), filed by Kentucky CVS Pharmacy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(JJ) [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]
July 23, 2021 STIPULATION in State Court Record to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. PDF document available at DE #1 -2. (JJ)cc: COR [Transferred from kyed on 8/11/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell, KY et al v. Abbott Laboratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Russell, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Jenkins, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Pineville, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Worthington, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Vanceburg, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Greenup, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of South Shore, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Bellefonte, KY
Represented By: Andrew M. Grabhorn
Represented By: Michael D. Grabhorn
Represented By: William D. Nefzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Breaux Ballard Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: E. Frederick Straub, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan T. Polczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Bandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: John David Dyche
Represented By: Scott T. Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Jordan M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Donald L. Miller, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Allan Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Company
Represented By: Edmund J. Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Carol Dan Browning
Represented By: Carolyn Purcell
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Moad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Conor Brendan O'Croinin
Represented By: Robert D. Bobrow
Represented By: Robert Estes Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Kentukcy, Inc
Represented By: Elisabeth S. Gray
Represented By: Mark S. Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Corporation
Represented By: Frank Kern Tremper
Represented By: Mark G. Arnzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?