Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc. et al v. Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio
Plaintiff: Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., James R. Pospishil, John E. Pospishil, Frederick M and Laurie M, Trustees of the Loria Fa Loria, Terry Properties, Ltd., Palmieri Builders, Inc., Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria and State of Ohio
Defendant: Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio
Case Number: 1:2022cv00200
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Case reassigned to District Judge Charles E. Fleming pursuant to General Order 2022-07. (F,AW)
March 18, 2022 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2022-07. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (F,AW)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/3/22 setting a case management conference on 4/15/2022 at 12:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Judge James S. Gwin. This Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel, and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Rule 30.1)(T,A)
March 2, 2022 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio. (Rogers, Tonya)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio on 2/10/2022, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Marked COVID-19. Related document(s) #4 . (V,AR)
February 8, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio Board of Trustees placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt #7021 1970 0001 0016 5875. (R,AP)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Palmieri Builders, Inc., filed by Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria, Palmieri Builders, Inc., James R. Pospishil, John E. Pospishil, State of Ohio, Terry Properties, Ltd. (Slagter, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Terry Properties, Ltd., filed by Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria, Palmieri Builders, Inc., James R. Pospishil, John E. Pospishil, State of Ohio, Terry Properties, Ltd. (Slagter, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., filed by Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria, Palmieri Builders, Inc., James R. Pospishil, John E. Pospishil, Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., State of Ohio, Terry Properties, Ltd. (Slagter, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Summons filed by Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria, Palmieri Builders, Inc., James R. Pospishil, John E. Pospishil, Terry Properties, Ltd. Related document(s) #1 . (Slagter, John)
February 7, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria, Palmieri Builders, Inc., James R. Pospishil, John E. Pospishil, Terry Properties, Ltd. Related document(s) #1 . (Slagter, John)
February 7, 2022 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 7, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI)
February 7, 2022 Notice by Clerk that Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (L,MI)
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint for declaratory judgment, monetary, injunctive, and other relief, and petition for writ of mandamus against Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11256739. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 1:20-cv-01725. Filed by Palmieri Builders, Inc., Frederick M. Loria, Laurie M. Loria, Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc., John E. Pospishil, James R. Pospishil, Terry Properties, Ltd. (Slagter, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc. et al v. Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunswick Hills Golf Club, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Pospishil
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Pospishil
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick M and Laurie M, Trustees of the Loria Fa Loria
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Properties, Ltd.
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmieri Builders, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick M. Loria
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie M. Loria
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Anthony R. Vacanti
Represented By: Danielle Marie Easton
Represented By: Lindsey E. Sacher
Represented By: John P. Slagter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brunswick Hills Township, Ohio
Represented By: Gregory A. Beck
Represented By: James F. Mathews
Represented By: Tonya J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?