United States of America v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Gary T. Smith, Joan R. Smith, Joan Smith, Community Loan Servicing, LLC, Al Newyear, Kathleen Dambrosi, State of Ohio, Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio and Sam Dambrosi
Case Number: 1:2022cv00275
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Charles Esque Fleming
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Joan R. Smith (Trustee of The 1271 Trust) waiver sent on 2/28/22, answer due 4/29/22 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
March 30, 2022 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Joan R. Smith(individually) waiver sent on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
March 30, 2022 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Gary T. Smith waiver sent on 2/28/2022, answer due 4/29/2022 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
March 25, 2022 Filing 17 Answer to #8 Amended complaint filed by Sam Dambrosi and Al Newyear. (Okun, Jill)
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 Answer to #8 Amended complaint, filed by Community Loan Servicing, LLC. (Farkas, Bryan)
March 17, 2022 Case reassigned to District Judge Charles E. Fleming pursuant to General Order 2022-07. (R,EM)
March 16, 2022 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Sam Dambrosi waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
March 16, 2022 Filing 14 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Sam Dambrosi. (L,Br)
March 16, 2022 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance by Jill G. Okun and Fred J. Pompeani filed on behalf of Kathleen Dambrosi, Al Newyear. (Okun, Jill)
March 15, 2022 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by United States of America. Al Newyear waiver sent on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022 filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
March 15, 2022 Filing 11 Answer to #8 Amended complaint, filed by Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio. (Grabenstein, Matthew)
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by State of Ohio. (McCandlish, Joseph)
March 11, 2022 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Community Loan Servicing, LLC. (Farkas, Bryan)
March 11, 2022 Filing 8 Amended complaint against Community Loan Servicing, LLC, Al Newyear, Gary T. Smith, Joan Smith(Trustee Of "The 1271 Trust"), Joan R. Smith(individually), State of Ohio, Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio and adding new party defendant(s) Sam Dambrosi. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Sam Dambrosi) (Bednar, Philip)
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by personal service executed upon Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio on 3/2/2022, filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance Notice by Bryan J. Farkas and Marcel C. Duhamel filed by on behalf of Community Loan Servicing, LLC. (Farkas, Bryan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Community Loan Servicing, LLC on 2/22/2022, filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
February 22, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service by personal service executed upon State of Ohio on 2/22/2022, filed on behalf of United States of America (Bednar, Philip)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Community Loan Servicing, LLC, Kathleen Dambrosi, Al Newyear, Gary T. Smith, Joan Smith (Trustee Of "The 1271 Trust"), Joan R. Smith (individually), State of Ohio and Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI)
February 22, 2022 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI)
February 22, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (L,MI)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 Supplement to Complaint, - Corrected Summonses (to include case number), filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Joan Smith individually, #2 Summons Joan Smith as Trustee, #3 Summons Al Newyear, #4 Summons Kathleen Dambrosi, #5 Summons Community Loan Servicing LLC, #6 Summons State of Ohio, #7 Summons Treasurer of Cuyahoga County)(Bednar, Philip)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Gary Smith, #3 Summons Joan Smith individually, #4 Summons Joan Smith as Trustee, #5 Summons Community Loan Servicing LLC, #6 Summons Al Newyear, #7 Summons Kathleen Dambrosi, #8 Summons State of Ohio, #9 Summons Treasurer of Cuyahoga County) (Bednar, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Philip L. Bednar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Bryan J. Farkas
Represented By: Marcel C. Duhamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Newyear
Represented By: Fred J. Pompeani
Represented By: Jill G. Okun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Dambrosi
Represented By: Fred J. Pompeani
Represented By: Jill G. Okun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Ohio
Represented By: Joseph M. McCandlish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer of Cuyahoga County, Ohio
Represented By: Matthew H. Grabenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Dambrosi
Represented By: Jill G. Okun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?