Lovell v. Park Place Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Samuel Lovell
Defendant: Park Place Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00595
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 Notice Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) filed by Samuel Lovell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
May 19, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Case Management Conference with telephonic case management conference to be held on 7/14/22 at 2:30 PM before Judge Christopher A. Boyko. This Court requires the participation of lead counsel. The Court will host the conference call and inform counsel by way of separate email of the telephone number for the conference call. Parties shall be available by phone, if needed. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting, #2 Consent Package)(L,Ja)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Park Place Technologies, LLC. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Park Place Technologies, LLC. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Park Place Technologies, LLC on 4/18/2022, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Samuel Lovell. Related document(s) #2 . (F,AW)
April 15, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Park Place Technologies, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7021 2720 0001 9499 8636. (M,CE)
April 13, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Park Place Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (H,Ch)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Park Place Technologies, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11369476.. Filed by Samuel Lovell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A-Consent Form) (Nilges, Hans)
April 13, 2022 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (H,Ch)
April 13, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovell v. Park Place Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lovell
Represented By: Hans A. Nilges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Place Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Carrie A. Valdez
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?