Campbell v. Havel et al
Plaintiff: Pro Se Allen F. Campbell and Allen F. Campbell
Defendant: Ava Havel, Manuela Hernandez and Jessie Garcia
Case Number: 1:2022cv00814
Filed: May 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service by Clerk unexecuted upon Ava Havel. Service attempted by certified mail on 7/3/2022 filed on behalf of Allen F. Campbell. Related document(s) #4 . (L,Br)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/23/2022 at 09:30 AM to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/08/22. (D,Ma)
July 1, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Lack of Perfection of Service on Manuela Caridad Pena filed by Ava Havel, Manuela Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)Related document(s) #7 .(Beseth, H.)
June 22, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Manuela Hernandez on 6/10/2022, filed on behalf of Allen F. Campbell. Related document(s) #4 . (L,MI)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Jessie Garcia on 6/11/2022, filed on behalf of Allen F. Campbell. Related document(s) #4 . (L,MI)
June 21, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 26, 2022 to file Initial Responsive Pleading filed by Defendant Jessie Garcia. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Turner, Peter)
June 21, 2022 Copy of [non-document] Order of 6/21/22 mailed to Allen F. Campbell at 322 Cumberland Road, Fairhope, AL 36532 on 6/21/22. (LC,S)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: Unopposed Motion of Defendant Jessie Garcia for Extension of Time Within Which to File Initial Responsive Pleading is granted to 7/26/22. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/21/22. (LC,S) re #5
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 Original Summons issued at counter to Allen Campbell for service upon Jessie Garcia, Ava Havel and Manuela Hernandez. (H,Ch)
June 7, 2022 Filing 3 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Allen F. Campbell. (H,Ch)
June 7, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jessie Garcia placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 1640 0001 5070 1242. (H,Ch)
June 7, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Manuela Hernandez placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 1640 0001 5070 1266. (H,Ch)
June 7, 2022 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ava Havel placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7019 1640 0001 5070 1273. (H,Ch)
June 6, 2022 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint filed by Allen F. Campbell. Related document(s) #1 . (L,MI)
May 18, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Jessie Garcia, Ava Havel and Manuela Hernandez. Filing fee paid, $402.00. Receipt # 14660138770. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil actions 1:18-cv-162 and 1:20-cv-473. Filed by Allen F. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Incomplete), #2 Notice to Clerk and Court as to Possible Related Matters, #3 Summons, #4 Cover Letter, #5 FedEx Shipping Label). (H,Ch) Modified related cases on 5/19/2022 (M,CE).
May 18, 2022 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case. (H,Ch)
May 18, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (H,Ch)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Havel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pro Se Allen F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ava Havel
Represented By: H. William Beseth, III
Represented By: William J. Stavole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuela Hernandez
Represented By: H. William Beseth, III
Represented By: William J. Stavole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Garcia
Represented By: Peter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?