McLean v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lee McLean
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00867
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: J Philip Calabrese
Referring Judge: Carmen E Henderson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until August 8, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 7/21/2022.(S,KL)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 8, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Related document #1 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (Johnson, Lisa)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]: granting Plaintiff's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Kelsey Young for Kathryn Lee McLean. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (ECF No. #7 ). Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 6/3/2022.(Y,A)
June 1, 2022 Filing 7 Motion for attorney Kelsey Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-11449069, filed by Plaintiff Kathryn Lee McLean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilson, Rachel)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (G,M)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/26/2022. (G,M)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson on 5/26/2022.(G,M)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,TL)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kathryn McLean. (Wilson, Rachel)
May 25, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kathryn McLean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Rachel)
May 25, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 05/25/2022. (M,TL)
May 25, 2022 Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (M,TL)
May 25, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Henderson. (M,TL)
May 25, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (M,TL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLean v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Lee McLean
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Represented By: Kelsey Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?