Law v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Teresa Law
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv00900
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Darrell A Clay
Referring Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 31, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Lisa)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until August 31, 2022 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Commissioner of Social Security Administration answer due 8/31/2022. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 7/27/2022.(S,DM)
June 6, 2022 Filing 6 Consent of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay for further proceedings. Related Document #5 . Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/6/2022. (M,S)
June 6, 2022 Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay assigned to case. pursuant to consent. Judge Donald C. Nugent terminated. Related document(s) #6 . (L,MI)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Johnson, Lisa)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Ke)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay on 5/31/2022. (R,Ke)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11444147. Filed by Teresa Law. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Margolius, Marcia)
May 31, 2022 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Notice of Social Security Complaint: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.3.1, the Clerk shall issue this Notice of Electronic Filing to notify the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. No summonses will issue. The certified administrative record shall be filed by the Social Security Administration within 60 days of this Notice. (L,MI)
May 31, 2022 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/31/2022. (L,MI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Law
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?